Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 05/21/2021 at 02:16:37 (UTC).

CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT LLC V. SAIMA GUICE

Case Summary

On 03/18/2021 CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SAIMA GUICE. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Wesley Heidt. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********COCI

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Volusia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Wesley Heidt

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT LLC

ANDREU PALMA LAVIN & SOLIS PLLC

Defendant

SAIMA GUICE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JORGE L PALMA

Attorney at ANDREU PALMA LAVIN & SOLIS PLLC

815 Nw 57Th Ave Suite 401

Miami, FL 33126

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION FOR/OF PAYMENT(S)

05/14/2021 : STIPULATION FOR/OF PAYMENT(S)

RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

05/13/2021 : RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

04/21/2021 : ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

PRE-TRIAL REMOTE SUMMONS ISSUED

04/06/2021 : PRE-TRIAL REMOTE SUMMONS ISSUED

MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

03/18/2021 : MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

REQUEST SUMMONS

03/18/2021 : REQUEST SUMMONS

COMPLAINT

03/18/2021 : COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-Trial; Court Officer: Wesley Heidt; Location: WHZM, Zoom Meetings; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: STIPULATION FOR/OF PAYMENT(S); Description: agst Saima Guice Instrument: 2021118276 Book: 8051 Page: 2685

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED; Description: Saima Guice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 175.00; Final Amount: 175.00; Credits: -175.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL REMOTE SUMMONS ISSUED; Description: To SAIMA GUICE rtn to atty/sop via e-service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.; Description: by Crown Asset Mgmt LLC (no order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: NOTICE FOR REDACTION/CONFIDENTIALITY; Description: by Crown Asset Mgmt LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: as to Saima Guice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ANDREU PALMA LAVIN SOLIS PLLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Crown Asset Management LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Palma, Jorge L, ESQ.