Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 05/03/2020 at 03:33:26 (UTC).

CREDIT CORP SOLUTIONS INC V. MANUEL GONZALEZ

Case Summary

On 12/28/2019 CREDIT CORP SOLUTIONS INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MANUEL GONZALEZ. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Angela A. Dempsey. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CODL

  • Filing Date:

    12/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Volusia County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Volusia County Courthouse Deland

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Angela A. Dempsey

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

POLLACK & ROSEN P A

CREDIT CORP SOLUTIONS INC

Defendant

MANUEL GONZALEZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ANTHONY J STEELE

Attorney at POLLACK & ROSEN P A

1980 Michigan Avenue

Cocoa, FL 32922

 

Court Documents

DEFAULT JUDGMENT / FINAL JUDGMENT

04/23/2020 : DEFAULT JUDGMENT / FINAL JUDGMENT

AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE / VENUE

04/10/2020 : AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE / VENUE

AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF/FOR COSTS

04/10/2020 : AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF/FOR COSTS

NOTICE OF FILING

04/10/2020 : NOTICE OF FILING

DEFAULT

02/13/2020 : DEFAULT

COURT NOTES

02/13/2020 : COURT NOTES

RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

02/06/2020 : RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

01/14/2020 : ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

12/31/2019 : PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

12/28/2019 : REQUEST SUMMONS

DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

12/28/2019 : DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

12/28/2019 : MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

12/28/2019 : STATEMENT OF CLAIM

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Docket Type: DEFAULT JUDGMENT / FINAL JUDGMENT; Description: agst Manuel Gonzalez; $2046.82 Instrument: 2020079758 Book: 7846 Page: 3894

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Docket Type: AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE / VENUE; Description: as to Manuel Gonzalez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Docket Type: AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF/FOR COSTS; Description: by Joseph F Rosen Esq

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Docket Type: NOTICE OF FILING; Description: exhibits by Credit Corp Solutions Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-Trial; Court Officer: Angela A. Dempsey; Location: 1, DeLand; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Docket Type: DEFAULT; Description: as to Manuel Gonzalez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Docket Type: COURT NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED; Description: Manuel Gonzalez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 175.00; Final Amount: 175.00; Credits: -175.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS; Description: To MANUEL GONZALEZ fwd to pltf atty for SOP via e-service; cc pltf atty via e-service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Manuel Gonzalez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2019
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: NOTICE FOR REDACTION/CONFIDENTIALITY; Description: by Credit Corp Solutions Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS; Description: by Anthony Steele, Esq

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.; Description: by Credit Corp Solutions Inc w/out prop order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where POLLACK & ROSEN P A is a litigant

Latest cases where CREDIT CORP SOLUTIONS INC. ASSIGNEE OF SYNCHRONY BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STEELE, ANTHONY JOHN