Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 07/07/2020 at 16:04:10 (UTC).

CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION V. RICHARD CEGLAREK

Case Summary

On 01/23/2020 CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against RICHARD CEGLAREK. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is A. Christian Miller. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CODL

  • Filing Date:

    01/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Volusia County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Volusia County Courthouse Deland

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

A. Christian Miller

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION

HAYT HAYT & LANDAU PL

Defendant

RICHARD CEGLAREK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JASON S DRAGUTSKY

Attorney at HAYT HAYT & LANDAU P L

7765 Sw 87 Ave Ste 101

Miami, FL 33173

 

Court Documents

ORDER APPROVING / AFFIRMING / CONFIRMING STIPULATION or SETTLEMENT

07/06/2020 : ORDER APPROVING / AFFIRMING / CONFIRMING STIPULATION or SETTLEMENT

STIPULATION FOR/OF PAYMENT(S)

07/06/2020 : STIPULATION FOR/OF PAYMENT(S)

NOTICE OF/FOR MEDIATION/ARBITRATION

06/22/2020 : NOTICE OF/FOR MEDIATION/ARBITRATION

NOTICE OF/FOR HEARING

06/17/2020 : NOTICE OF/FOR HEARING

ORDER OF/FOR MEDIATION/ARBITRATION

06/08/2020 : ORDER OF/FOR MEDIATION/ARBITRATION

NOTICE OF/FOR HEARING

06/08/2020 : NOTICE OF/FOR HEARING

NOTICE / ORDER OF CANCELING OF/FOR TRIAL

04/13/2020 : NOTICE / ORDER OF CANCELING OF/FOR TRIAL

NOTICE OF/FOR MEDIATION/ARBITRATION

04/08/2020 : NOTICE OF/FOR MEDIATION/ARBITRATION

MOTION FOR JUDGMENT / FINAL JUDGMENT

03/26/2020 : MOTION FOR JUDGMENT / FINAL JUDGMENT

ORDER OF/FOR MEDIATION/ARBITRATION

03/12/2020 : ORDER OF/FOR MEDIATION/ARBITRATION

ORDER OF/FOR TRIAL

03/11/2020 : ORDER OF/FOR TRIAL

COURT NOTES

03/11/2020 : COURT NOTES

RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

02/19/2020 : RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

02/03/2020 : ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

01/28/2020 : PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

01/23/2020 : REQUEST SUMMONS

MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

01/23/2020 : MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

COMPLAINT

01/23/2020 : COMPLAINT

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Non-Jury Trial; Court Officer: A. Christian Miller; Location: D-314, DeLand; Status: Cancelled; Comments: (Zoom) & Pltf's M/Summary Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Docket Type: ORDER APPROVING / AFFIRMING / CONFIRMING STIPULATION or SETTLEMENT; Description: Instrument: 2020121262 Book: 7874 Page: 2497

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Docket Type: STIPULATION FOR/OF PAYMENT(S); Description: agst Richard Geglarek Instrument: 2020121239 Book: 7874 Page: 2445

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Docket Type: NOTICE OF/FOR MEDIATION/ARBITRATION; Description: before County Court Mediation Services

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Docket Type: NOTICE OF/FOR HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Docket Type: ORDER OF/FOR MEDIATION/ARBITRATION; Description: w/County Court Mediation Services

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Docket Type: NOTICE OF/FOR TRIAL; Description: (via Zoom)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Non-Jury Trial; Court Officer: A. Christian Miller; Location: D-314, DeLand; Status: Cancelled; Comments: 1 hr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Docket Type: NOTICE / ORDER OF CANCELING OF/FOR TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Docket Type: NOTICE OF/FOR MEDIATION/ARBITRATION; Description: w/County Court Mediation Services

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: ORDER OF/FOR TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: COURT NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED; Description: Richard Ceglarek

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 300.00; Final Amount: 300.00; Credits: -300.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS; Description: To RICHARD CEGLAREK fwd to pltf atty via e-service for sop; cc pltf atty via e-service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Richard Ceglarek

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.; Description: by Credit Acceptance Corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HAYT HAYT & LANDAU P L is a litigant

Latest cases where Credit Acceptance Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JASON DRAGUTSKY