Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 03/07/2020 at 02:11:10 (UTC).

COREY P JENKINS V. EMILY CROTZ

Case Summary

On 12/27/2019 COREY P JENKINS filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against EMILY CROTZ. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Stasia Warren and Alex Alvarez. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********FMCI

  • Filing Date:

    12/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Volusia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Stasia Warren

Alex Alvarez

 

Party Details

Petitioner

COREY P JENKINS

Respondent

EMILY CROTZ

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2020
  • Docket(#18) Docket Type: FINAL ORDER / JUDGMENT FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE; Description: Instrument: 2020043118 Book: 7822 Page: 173

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • Docket(#17) Docket Type: REPORT OF FINDINGS OF GENERAL MASTER/MAGISTRATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • Docket(#16) Docket Type: WAIVER BY/FOR PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • HearingSession Type: Case Management Conference; Court Officer: Alex Alvarez; Location: CI309, City Island Courthouse; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • Docket(#15) Docket Type: AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF SERVICE; Description: to resp 01/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • Docket(#14) Docket Type: ANSWER BY/FOR RESPONDENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • Docket(#13) Docket Type: NOTICE / ORDER FOR CASE MGMT CONF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • Docket(#12) Docket Type: ORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MASTER/MAGISTRATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 0.00; Final Amount: 0.00; Credits: 0.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 0.00; Final Amount: 0.00; Credits: 0.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 12/27/2019
  • Docket(#10) Docket Type: NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • Docket(#9) Docket Type: CERTIFICATE OF/FOR COMPLIANCE; Description: w/Mandatory Disclosure by Corey P Jenkins

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS; Description: permission Corey P Jenkins

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: INFORMATION SHEET; Description: new suits checklist

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT; Description: Corey P Jenkins

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: NOTICE OF FILING SOCIAL SEC NUMBER; Description: Corey P Jenkins

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: COPY OF ID/DRIVER'S LICENSE; Description: Corey P Jenkins

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF INSOLVENCY / INDIGENCY; Description: Corey P Jenkins

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less