This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 06/23/2022 at 20:10:13 (UTC).

CORA HEALTH SERVICES INC DBA CORA PHYSICAL THERAPY PATIENT JESSICA MEDINA V. FARMERS PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 03/17/2022 CORA HEALTH SERVICES INC DBA CORA PHYSICAL THERAPY PATIENT JESSICA MEDINA filed an Other lawsuit against FARMERS PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Robert A. Sanders, Jr. and Rachel D. Myers. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CODL

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Robert A. Sanders, Jr.

Rachel D. Myers

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CORA HEALTH SERVICES INC DBA CORA PHYSICAL THERAPY PATIENT JESSICA MEDINA

CORA PHYSICAL THERAPY

JESSICA MEDINA

GED LAWYERS LLP

Boca Raton, FL 33487

Defendant

FARMERS PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Tallahassee, FL 32314-6200

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHAD CHRISTENSEN

Attorney at GED LAWYERS LLP

7171 N Federal Highway

Boca Raton, FL 33487

Defendant Attorney

TAISHA S EASTERLING

Office Of Sanabria & Marsh, 2290 Lucien Way Ste 280

Maitland, FL 32751

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

03/17/2022 : COMPLAINT

REQUEST SUMMONS

03/17/2022 : REQUEST SUMMONS

PRE-TRIAL REMOTE SUMMONS ISSUED

03/23/2022 : PRE-TRIAL REMOTE SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

04/05/2022 : NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

04/28/2022 : NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

05/26/2022 : NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

NOTICE OF/FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

06/17/2022 : NOTICE OF/FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

06/17/2022 : FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketSession Type: Case Management Conference; Court Officer: Rachel D. Myers; Location: RYZM, Zoom Meetings; Status: Cancelled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: NOTICE OF/FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Description: w/prej by Cora Health Services Inc etc (Patient: Jessica Medina) Instrument: 2022145870 Book: 8271 Page: 4762

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-Trial; Court Officer: Robert A. Sanders, Jr.; Location: RSZM, Zoom Meetings; Status: Cancelled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT; Description: by Cora Health Services Inc.,etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Description: of Taisha Easterling obo Farmers Property & Casualty Ins Co w/designation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS; Description: by CFO obo Farmers Property and Casualty Ins Co

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 80.00; Final Amount: 80.00; Credits: -80.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL REMOTE SUMMONS ISSUED; Description: To FARMERS PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY fwd to pltfs atty via eservice for SOP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Farmers Property and Casualty Ins Co

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FARMERS PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, a is a litigant

Latest cases where GED LAWYERS LLP is a litigant

Latest cases where Cora Health Services, Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer EASTERLING , TAISHA