This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 07/24/2022 at 16:43:36 (UTC).

CORA HEALTH SERVICES INC DBA CORA PHYSICAL THERAPY PATIENT GEORGINA LEWIS V. GENERAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE SERVICES INC

Case Summary

On 06/10/2022 CORA HEALTH SERVICES INC DBA CORA PHYSICAL THERAPY PATIENT GEORGINA LEWIS filed an Other lawsuit against GENERAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE SERVICES INC. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Angela A. Dempsey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CODL

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Angela A. Dempsey

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CORA HEALTH SERVICES INC DBA CORA PHYSICAL THERAPY PATIENT GEORGINA LEWIS

CORA PHYSICAL THERAPY

GEORGINA LEWIS

GED LAWYERS LLP

Boca Raton, FL 33487

Defendant

GENERAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE SERVICES INC

Tallahassee, FL 32314-6200

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHAD CHRISTENSEN

Attorney at GED LAWYERS LLP

7171 N Federal Highway

Boca Raton, FL 33487

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

06/10/2022 : COMPLAINT

REQUEST SUMMONS

06/10/2022 : REQUEST SUMMONS

PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

06/13/2022 : PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

06/13/2022 : PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

RETURNED SUMMONS SERVICE ACCEPTED BY

06/24/2022 : RETURNED SUMMONS SERVICE ACCEPTED BY

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2023
  • DocketSession Type: Case Management Conference; Court Officer: Angela A. Dempsey; Location: D-312, DeLand; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-Trial; Court Officer: Angela A. Dempsey; Location: 1, DeLand; Status: Cancelled; Comments: Summons Exec

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5); Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS SERVICE ACCEPTED BY; Description: Chief Financial Officer obo General Automobile Insurance Company(The)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 55.00; Final Amount: 55.00; Credits: -55.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4); Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS; Description: CORRECTED To THE GENERAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE SERVICES INC rtn to Ptf's Atty via e service for sop

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3); Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS; Description: To GENERAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE SERVICES INC rtn to Ptf's Atty via e service for sop

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2); Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: The General Automobile Insurance Services Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1); Docket Type: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GED LAWYERS LLP is a litigant

Latest cases where THE GENERAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE SERVICES INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Cora Health Services, Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHRISTENSEN , CHAD