This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 09/03/2022 at 14:02:46 (UTC).

CORA HEALTH SERVICES INC DBA CORA PHYSICAL THERAPY PATIENT CHANTZ RENNER V. PROGRESSIVE CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 07/21/2022 CORA HEALTH SERVICES INC DBA CORA PHYSICAL THERAPY PATIENT CHANTZ RENNER filed an Other lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert A. Sanders, Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********COCI

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Robert A. Sanders, Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CORA HEALTH SERVICES INC DBA CORA PHYSICAL THERAPY PATIENT CHANTZ RENNER

CORA PHYSICAL THERAPY

CHANTZ RENNER

GED LAWYERS LLP

Boca Raton, FL 33487

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Tallahassee, FL 32314-6200

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHAD CHRISTENSEN

Attorney at GED LAWYERS LLP

7171 N Federal Highway

Boca Raton, FL 33487

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

07/21/2022 : COMPLAINT

REQUEST SUMMONS

07/21/2022 : REQUEST SUMMONS

PRE-TRIAL REMOTE SUMMONS ISSUED

07/26/2022 : PRE-TRIAL REMOTE SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

08/10/2022 : NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/13/2023
  • DocketSession Type: Case Management Conference; Court Officer: Robert A. Sanders, Jr.; Location: RSZM, Zoom Meetings; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-Trial; Court Officer: Robert A. Sanders, Jr.; Location: RSZM, Zoom Meetings; Status: Cancelled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4); Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS; Description: Chief Financial Officer obo Progressive Casualty Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 55.00; Final Amount: 55.00; Credits: -55.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3); Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL REMOTE SUMMONS ISSUED; Description: To PROGRESSIVE CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY Frwd to Pltf's Atty via e-service for SOP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2); Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: To Progressive Casualty Ins Co

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1); Docket Type: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GED LAWYERS LLP is a litigant

Latest cases where Cora Health Services, Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Progressive Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHRISTENSEN , CHAD