This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 11/21/2022 at 21:17:44 (UTC).

CORA HEALTH SERVICES INC DBA CORA PHYSICAL THERAPY PATIENT ARIELLE NEWMAN V. ENCOMPASS INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA

Case Summary

On 09/13/2022 CORA HEALTH SERVICES INC DBA CORA PHYSICAL THERAPY PATIENT ARIELLE NEWMAN filed an Other lawsuit against ENCOMPASS INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert A. Sanders, Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********COCI

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Robert A. Sanders, Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CORA HEALTH SERVICES INC DBA CORA PHYSICAL THERAPY PATIENT ARIELLE NEWMAN

CORA PHYSICAL THERAPY

ARIELLE NEWMAN

GED LAWYERS LLP

Boca Raton, FL 33487

Defendant

ENCOMPASS INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA

Tallahassee, FL 32314-6200

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHAD CHRISTENSEN

Attorney at GED LAWYERS LLP

7171 N Federal Highway

Boca Raton, FL 33487

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

09/13/2022 : COMPLAINT

REQUEST SUMMONS

09/13/2022 : REQUEST SUMMONS

PRE-TRIAL REMOTE SUMMONS ISSUED

09/14/2022 : PRE-TRIAL REMOTE SUMMONS ISSUED

CONTINUED FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS

10/11/2022 : CONTINUED FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2023
  • DocketSession Type: Case Management Conference; Court Officer: Robert A. Sanders, Jr.; Location: RSZM, Zoom Meetings; Status: Scheduled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-Trial; Court Officer: Robert A. Sanders, Jr.; Location: RSZM, Zoom Meetings; Status: Scheduled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4); Docket Type: CONTINUED FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 80.00; Final Amount: 80.00; Credits: -80.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3); Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL REMOTE SUMMONS ISSUED; Description: To ENCOMPASS INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA Frwd to Pltf's Atty via e-service for SOP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2); Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: To Encompass Ins Co of America

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1); Docket Type: COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Encompass Insurance Company of America is a litigant

Latest cases where GED LAWYERS LLP is a litigant

Latest cases where Cora Health Services, Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHRISTENSEN , CHAD