This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 12/01/2022 at 03:38:14 (UTC).

COMPREHENSIVE HEALTH ORLANDO INC PATIENT JAMES CHRISTOPHER VEGUILLA V. PERMANENT GENERAL ASSURANCE CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 09/13/2022 COMPREHENSIVE HEALTH ORLANDO INC PATIENT JAMES CHRISTOPHER VEGUILLA filed an Other lawsuit against PERMANENT GENERAL ASSURANCE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Angela A. Dempsey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CODL

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Angela A. Dempsey

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

COMPREHENSIVE HEALTH ORLANDO INC PATIENT JAMES CHRISTOPHER VEGUILLA

JAMES CHRISTOPHER VEGUILLA

GED LAWYERS LLP

Boca Raton, FL 33487

Defendant

PERMANENT GENERAL ASSURANCE CORPORATION

Tallahassee, FL 32314-6200

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHAD CHRISTENSEN

Attorney at GED LAWYERS LLP

7171 N Federal Highway

Boca Raton, FL 33487

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

09/13/2022 : COMPLAINT

REQUEST SUMMONS

09/13/2022 : REQUEST SUMMONS

PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

09/14/2022 : PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

RETURNED SUMMONS SERVICE ACCEPTED BY

09/27/2022 : RETURNED SUMMONS SERVICE ACCEPTED BY

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/06/2023
  • DocketSession Type: Case Management Conference; Court Officer: Angela A. Dempsey; Location: D-312, DeLand; Status: Scheduled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-Trial; Court Officer: Angela A. Dempsey; Location: 1, DeLand; Status: Cancelled; Comments: Summons Exec

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4); Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS SERVICE ACCEPTED BY; Description: CFO obo Permanent General Assurance Corp

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 55.00; Final Amount: 55.00; Credits: -55.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3); Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS; Description: To PERMANENT GENERAL ASSURANCE CORPORATION Frwd to Pltf's Atty via e-service for SOP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2); Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: To Permanent General Assurance Corp

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1); Docket Type: COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GED LAWYERS LLP is a litigant

Latest cases where COMPREHENSIVE HEALTH ORLANDO DBA is a litigant

Latest cases where Permanent General Assurance Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHRISTENSEN , CHAD