This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 12/31/2022 at 10:42:04 (UTC).

COMPREHENSIVE HEALTH ORLANDO INC A/A/O JOSHUA JAMES EATON V. PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 10/27/2022 COMPREHENSIVE HEALTH ORLANDO INC A/A/O JOSHUA JAMES EATON filed an Other lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Rachel D. Myers. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CODL

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Rachel D. Myers

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

COMPREHENSIVE HEALTH ORLANDO INC A/A/O JOSHUA JAMES EATON

JOSHUA JAMES EATON

KIMBERLY SIMOES PA

Deland, FL 32720

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIMBERLY P SIMOES

Attorney at KIMBERLY P SIMOES P A

230 N Woodland Blvd Suite 305

Deland, FL 32720

Defendant Attorney

AUTUMN LESTER

Andrews Biernacki Davis, 390 N Orange Ave Ste 2100

Orlando, FL 32801

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/27/2022 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

10/27/2022 : COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF SERVICE

10/27/2022 : NOTICE OF SERVICE

REQUEST SUMMONS

10/27/2022 : REQUEST SUMMONS

PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

11/03/2022 : PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

11/28/2022 : NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

11/30/2022 : NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2023
  • DocketSession Type: Case Management Conference; Court Officer: Rachel D. Myers; Location: RYZM, Zoom Meetings; Status: Scheduled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-Trial; Court Officer: Rachel D. Myers; Location: RYZM, Zoom Meetings; Status: Cancelled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7); Docket Type: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Description: of Autumn Lester obo Progressive Select Ins Co

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6); Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS; Description: by CFO State of FL obo Progressive Select Ins Co

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 55.00; Final Amount: 55.00; Credits: -55.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5); Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS; Description: To PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY fwd to pltfs atty via eservice for sop

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4); Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Progressive Select Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3); Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE; Description: of CMO by Comprehensive Health Orlando Inc.,etc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2); Docket Type: COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1); Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COMPREHENSIVE HEALTH ORLANDO DBA is a litigant

Latest cases where PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer AUTUMN LESTER