This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 11/29/2022 at 07:32:43 (UTC).

COMPREHENSIVE HEALTH ORLANDO INC A/A/O DESMOND BUCHANAN V. NATIONWIDE GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 08/29/2022 COMPREHENSIVE HEALTH ORLANDO INC A/A/O DESMOND BUCHANAN filed an Other lawsuit against NATIONWIDE GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Rachel D. Myers. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CODL

  • Filing Date:

    08/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Rachel D. Myers

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

COMPREHENSIVE HEALTH ORLANDO INC A/A/O DESMOND BUCHANAN

DESMOND BUCHANAN

KIMBERLY SIMOES PA

Deland, FL 32720

Defendant

NATIONWIDE GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIMBERLY P SIMOES

Attorney at KIMBERLY P SIMOES P A

230 N Woodland Blvd Suite 305

Deland, FL 32720

Defendant Attorney

MELANIE Y PATRICH

Attorney at BANKER LOPEZ GASSLER PA

501 360 Central Ave Ste 700

St Petersburg, FL 33701

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

08/29/2022 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

08/29/2022 : COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF SERVICE

08/29/2022 : NOTICE OF SERVICE

REQUEST SUMMONS

08/29/2022 : REQUEST SUMMONS

PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

09/01/2022 : PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

09/09/2022 : NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

09/13/2022 : NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

MOTION TO INVOKE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

09/13/2022 : MOTION TO INVOKE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

DEMAND BY/FOR DEFENDANT

09/13/2022 : DEMAND BY/FOR DEFENDANT

ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

09/22/2022 : ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

MOTION TO DISMISS / DISSOLVE

09/22/2022 : MOTION TO DISMISS / DISSOLVE

MOTION FOR JUDGMENT / FINAL JUDGMENT

10/06/2022 : MOTION FOR JUDGMENT / FINAL JUDGMENT

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/11/2023
  • DocketSession Type: Case Management Conference; Court Officer: Rachel D. Myers; Location: RYZM, Zoom Meetings; Status: Scheduled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-Trial; Court Officer: Rachel D. Myers; Location: RYZM, Zoom Meetings; Status: Cancelled; Comments: Summons Exec

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12); Docket Type: MOTION FOR JUDGMENT / FINAL JUDGMENT; Description: by Nationwide General Ins Co

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11); Docket Type: MOTION TO DISMISS / DISSOLVE; Description: by Nationwide General Ins Co

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10); Docket Type: ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT; Description: Nationwide General Ins Co w/affirm defenses & demand for jury trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9); Docket Type: DEMAND BY/FOR DEFENDANT; Description: Nationwide General Ins Co for jury trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8); Docket Type: MOTION TO INVOKE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE; Description: by Nationwide General Ins Co

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7); Docket Type: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Description: of Melanie Y Patrich obo Nationwide General Ins Co w/designation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6); Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS; Description: by CFO obo Nationwide General Ins Co

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 55.00; Final Amount: 55.00; Credits: -55.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5); Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS; Description: To NATIONWIDE GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY fwd to pltfs atty via eservice for sop

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4); Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Nationwide General Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3); Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE; Description: of CMO by Comprehensive Health Orlando Inc.,etc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2); Docket Type: COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1); Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COMPREHENSIVE HEALTH ORLANDO DBA is a litigant

Latest cases where NATIONWIDE GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Patrich, Melanie Yael