Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 10/18/2020 at 06:44:53 (UTC).

COLONIAL MEDICAL CENTER INC D/B/A KISSIMMEE MEDICAL & WELLNESS CENTER A/A/O JOSE JIMENEZ V. GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/10/2019 COLONIAL MEDICAL CENTER INC D/B/A KISSIMMEE MEDICAL WELLNESS CENTER A/A/O JOSE JIMENEZ filed an Other lawsuit against GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Dawn P. Fields. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********COCI

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Volusia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Dawn P. Fields

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SIMOES DAVILA PLLC

KISSIMMEE MEDICAL & WELLNESS CENTER A/A/O JOSE JIMENEZ

JOSE JIMENEZ

COLONIAL MEDICAL CENTER INC D/B/A KISSIMMEE MEDICAL & WELLNESS CENTER A/A/O JOSE JIMENEZ

Defendant

GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KIMBERLY P SIMOES

Attorney at SIMOES DAVILA PLLC

910 Sw 1St Ave Ste 201

Ocala, FL 34474

JOSEPH W ENGEL JR

Attorney at SIMOES DAVILA PLLC

910 Sw 1St Ave Ste 201

Ocala, FL 34471

Defendant Attorney

ROBIN JACKSON BERNHARDT

1000 Legion Place Ste 850

Orlando, FL 32801

 

Court Documents

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

05/19/2020 : REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

04/30/2020 : REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

04/30/2020 : NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

RESPONSE BY/FOR DEFENDANT

01/15/2020 : RESPONSE BY/FOR DEFENDANT

RESPONSE BY/FOR DEFENDANT

01/15/2020 : RESPONSE BY/FOR DEFENDANT

ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

12/02/2019 : ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

COURT NOTES

11/12/2019 : COURT NOTES

NOTICE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

11/05/2019 : NOTICE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

11/05/2019 : NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

11/05/2019 : REQUEST TO PRODUCE

RESPONSE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

10/14/2019 : RESPONSE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

NOTICE OF SERVICE

10/14/2019 : NOTICE OF SERVICE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

09/25/2019 : REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

09/25/2019 : REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

09/25/2019 : NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

09/15/2019 : PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

09/10/2019 : REQUEST SUMMONS

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/10/2019 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) Docket Type: NOTICE OF ISSUE AND REQUEST TO DOCKET; Description: by Colonial Medical Center Inc.,etc 1day

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) Docket Type: RESPONSE BY/FOR DEFENDANT; Description: Geico to pltf's req for production

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) Docket Type: REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Description: (suppl) to Geico Indemnity Co by Colonial Medical Ctr Inc etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) Docket Type: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Description: (2nd) to Geico Indemnity Company by Colonial Medical etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Docket Type: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Description: (amd) of Joseph W Engel Jr obo Colonial Medical etc w/ designation of email address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Docket Type: RESPONSE BY/FOR DEFENDANT; Description: Geico Indemnity Co to Request for Inspection of original documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Docket Type: RESPONSE BY/FOR DEFENDANT; Description: Geico Indemnity Co to Request for Production

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Docket Type: RESPONSE BY/FOR DEFENDANT; Description: Geico Indemnity Co to Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE; Description: of Answers to Interrogs by Geico Indemnity Co

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Docket Type: ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT; Description: Geico Indemnity Co w/affirm defenses and Demand for Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Description: of Robin Jackson Bernhardt Esq obo GEICO Indemnity Company & designation of email

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Description: to Colonial Medical Center Inc etc by GEICO Indemnity Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Description: to Colonial Medical Center Inc etc by GEICO Indemnity Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Description: to Colonial Medical Center Inc etc by GEICO Indemnity Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2019
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 80.00; Final Amount: 80.00; Credits: -80.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2019
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS; Description: To GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY rtn to atty/sop via e-service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: as to Geico Indemnity Co

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KISSIMMEE MEDICAL & WELLNESS CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases where COLONIAL MEDICAL CENTER INC is a litigant

Latest cases where GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROBIN JACKSON BERNHARDT