Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 04/03/2020 at 11:06:51 (UTC).

COLONIAL MEDICAL CENTER INC AAO TARSHA COLEMAN V. OCEAN HARBOR CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 10/30/2019 COLONIAL MEDICAL CENTER INC AAO TARSHA COLEMAN filed an Other lawsuit against OCEAN HARBOR CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is A. Christian Miller. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CODL

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Volusia County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Volusia County Courthouse Deland

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

A. Christian Miller

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SIMOES DAVILA PLLC

TARSHA COLEMAN

COLONIAL MEDICAL CENTER INC AAO TARSHA COLEMAN

Defendant

OCEAN HARBOR CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KIMBERLY P SIMOES

Attorney at SIMOES DAVILA PLLC

910 Sw 1St Ave Ste 201

Ocala, FL 34474

JOSEPH W ENGEL JR

Attorney at SIMOES DAVILA PLLC

910 Sw 1St Ave Ste 201

Ocala, FL 34471

Defendant Attorney

GEORGE REYNOLDS

Attorney at LDP LAW & ASSOCIATES

11555 Heron Bay Blvd Ste 100A

Coral Springs, FL 33076

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF/FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

03/19/2020 : NOTICE OF/FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

01/02/2020 : ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

01/02/2020 : NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

REQUEST BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

01/02/2020 : REQUEST BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

NOTICE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

01/02/2020 : NOTICE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

MOTION BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

01/02/2020 : MOTION BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

01/02/2020 : REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

01/02/2020 : REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

01/02/2020 : NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

STIPULATION AND ORDER

12/18/2019 : STIPULATION AND ORDER

HEARING SHEET

12/18/2019 : HEARING SHEET

MOTION TO INVOKE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

12/17/2019 : MOTION TO INVOKE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

12/17/2019 : NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

RETURNED SUMMONS SERVICE ACCEPTED BY

12/10/2019 : RETURNED SUMMONS SERVICE ACCEPTED BY

PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

10/31/2019 : PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

10/30/2019 : REQUEST SUMMONS

COMPLAINT

10/30/2019 : COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/30/2019 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Docket Type: NOTICE OF/FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Description: w/prej by Colonial Medical Center Inc aao Tarsha Coleman Instrument: 2020058936 Book: 7831 Page: 4351

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Docket Type: ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT; Description: Ocean Harbor Casualty Insurance Co w/affirm defenses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Docket Type: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Description: of Joseph W Engel,Jr.,Esq obo Colonial Medical Center Inc.,etc and designation of email address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Docket Type: REQUEST BY/FOR PLAINTIFF; Description: Colonial Medical Center Inc.,etc for Inspection of original documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Docket Type: NOTICE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF; Description: Colonial Medical Center Inc.,etc of Rule 1.310b6 Deposition Request

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Docket Type: MOTION BY/FOR PLAINTIFF; Description: Colonial Medical Center Inc.,etc to deposit/retain disputed funds

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Docket Type: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Description: to Ocean Harbor Casualty Insurance Co by Colonial Medical Center Inc.,etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Docket Type: REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Description: to Ocean Harbor Casualty Insurance Co by Colonial Medical Center Inc.,etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Description: to Ocean Harbor Casualty Insurance Co by Colonial Medical Center Inc.,etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-Trial; Court Officer: A. Christian Miller; Location: D-314, DeLand; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: HEARING SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: MOTION TO INVOKE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE; Description: by Ocean Harbor Casualty Insurance Co and Demand for Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Description: of George R Reynolds,Esq obo Ocean Harbor Casualty Insurance Company and designation of email address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS SERVICE ACCEPTED BY; Description: Chief Financial Officer obo Ocean Harbor Casualty Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 55.00; Final Amount: 55.00; Credits: -55.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS; Description: To OCEAN HARBOR CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY ret to atty via e service for SOP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Ocean Harbor Casualty Ins Co

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COLONIAL MEDICAL CENTER INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Ocean Harbor Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Reynolds, George