Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 05/04/2020 at 02:35:22 (UTC).

CKS PRIME INVESTMENTS LLC V. ISRAEL MALDONADO

Case Summary

On 12/17/2019 CKS PRIME INVESTMENTS LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ISRAEL MALDONADO. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Randell H. Rowe, III. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CIDL

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Volusia County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Volusia County Courthouse Deland

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Randell H. Rowe, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

O & L LAW GROUP P L

CKS PRIME INVESTMENTS LLC

Defendant

ISRAEL MALDONADO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JONATHAN R SINGER

Attorney at O & L LAW P L

4818 W Gandy Blvd

Tampa, FL 33611

 

Court Documents

DEFAULT JUDGMENT / FINAL JUDGMENT

04/23/2020 : DEFAULT JUDGMENT / FINAL JUDGMENT

AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF PROOF / AMOUNT DUE

04/17/2020 : AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF PROOF / AMOUNT DUE

MOTION FOR JUDGMENT / FINAL JUDGMENT

04/17/2020 : MOTION FOR JUDGMENT / FINAL JUDGMENT

AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF/FOR COSTS

04/17/2020 : AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF/FOR COSTS

DEFAULT

03/17/2020 : DEFAULT

MOTION OF/FOR DEFAULT

03/13/2020 : MOTION OF/FOR DEFAULT

AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE / VENUE

03/13/2020 : AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE / VENUE

RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

02/01/2020 : RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

01/06/2020 : ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

12/18/2019 : TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

12/17/2019 : REQUEST SUMMONS

MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

12/17/2019 : MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

12/17/2019 : DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

COMPLAINT

12/17/2019 : COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/17/2019 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Docket Type: DEFAULT JUDGMENT / FINAL JUDGMENT; Description: agst Israel Maldonado; $28,936.71 Instrument: 2020080009 Book: 7846 Page: 4541

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Docket Type: AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF PROOF / AMOUNT DUE; Description: Lynne Williams obo CKS Prime Investments LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Docket Type: MOTION FOR JUDGMENT / FINAL JUDGMENT; Description: by CKS Prime Investments LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Docket Type: AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF/FOR COSTS; Description: Ali R Rahnavard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Docket Type: DEFAULT; Description: as to Israel Maldonado

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Docket Type: MOTION OF/FOR DEFAULT; Description: as to Israel Maldonado (no prop default)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Docket Type: AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE / VENUE; Description: as to Israel Maldonado

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED; Description: Israel Maldonado

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 400.00; Final Amount: 400.00; Credits: -400.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: TWENTY DAY SUMMONS; Description: To ISRAEL MALDONADO ret to atty via e service for SOP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Israel Maldonado

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.; Description: by CKS Prime Investments LLC w/o Or

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS; Description: by Jonathan R Singer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CKS Prime Investments LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Singer, Jonathan Robert, ESQ.