This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 12/27/2022 at 10:13:52 (UTC).

CHIROMED INJURY CENTER PA AAO SHEMIKA HODGE V. SECURITY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 10/29/2021 CHIROMED INJURY CENTER PA AAO SHEMIKA HODGE filed an Other lawsuit against SECURITY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Belle B. Schumann and Robert A. Sanders, Jr.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********COCI

  • Filing Date:

    10/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Belle B. Schumann

Robert A. Sanders, Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CHIROMED INJURY CENTER PA AAO SHEMIKA HODGE

SHEMIKA HODGE

KIMBERLY SIMOES P A

Ocala, FL 34471

Defendant

SECURITY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Tallahassee, FL 32314

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RAIZA LEAL

Attorney at SIMOES DAVILA PLLC

910 Sw 1St Ave Ste 201

Ocala, FL 34471

Defendant Attorney

TAISHA S EASTERLING

Office Of Ryan Acosta Farmer & Marsh, P O Box 258829

Oklahoma City, OK 73125-8829

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF/FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

12/20/2022 : NOTICE OF/FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

ORDER OF/FOR TRIAL

09/08/2022 : ORDER OF/FOR TRIAL

NOTICE FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

08/23/2022 : NOTICE FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS / NAME

08/18/2022 : NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS / NAME

NOTICE OF/FOR NEW COURT DATE

07/01/2022 : NOTICE OF/FOR NEW COURT DATE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

05/03/2022 : REQUEST TO PRODUCE

RESPONSE BY/FOR DEFENDANT

04/22/2022 : RESPONSE BY/FOR DEFENDANT

ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

04/22/2022 : ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

12/15/2021 : NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

12/14/2021 : NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

REQUEST BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

12/14/2021 : REQUEST BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

NOTICE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

12/14/2021 : NOTICE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

MOTION BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

12/14/2021 : MOTION BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

12/14/2021 : REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

12/14/2021 : REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

12/14/2021 : NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

11/22/2021 : NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

PRE-TRIAL REMOTE SUMMONS ISSUED

11/01/2021 : PRE-TRIAL REMOTE SUMMONS ISSUED

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/24/2023
  • DocketSession Type: Jury Trial; Court Officer: Robert A. Sanders, Jr.; Location: CI-10, City Island Courthouse; Status: Cancelled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2023
  • DocketSession Type: Docket Sounding; Court Officer: Robert A. Sanders, Jr.; Location: CI302, City Island Courthouse; Status: Cancelled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • DocketSession Type: Hearing; Court Officer: Robert A. Sanders, Jr.; Location: CI302, City Island Courthouse; Status: Cancelled; Comments: PTC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22); Docket Type: NOTICE OF/FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Description: w/prej by Chiromed Injury Center PA Etc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketSession Type: Case Management Conference; Court Officer: Robert A. Sanders, Jr.; Location: BSZM, Zoom Meetings; Status: Cancelled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketSession Type: Case Management Conference; Court Officer: Robert A. Sanders, Jr.; Location: RSZM, Zoom Meetings; Status: Cancelled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21); Docket Type: ORDER OF/FOR TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20); Docket Type: NOTICE FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL; Description: of Raiza Leal Esq obo Chiromed Injury Center PA etc w/designation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19); Docket Type: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS / NAME; Description: of law firm name to the Law Offices of Ryan Acosta Farmer & Marsh & disclosure

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18); Docket Type: NOTICE OF/FOR NEW COURT DATE; Description: Notice to parties that the hearing(s) previously scheduled on 9/13/2022 at 01:30p were rescheduled to 9/13/2022 at 01:30p in Zoom Meetings in Judge Sanders, Zoom Meeting ID: 386 257 6070 with Sanders, Robert A. Jr..

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7); Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Description: to Security National Insurance Co by Chiromed Injury Center PA.,etc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-Trial; Court Officer: Belle B. Schumann; Location: BSZM, Zoom Meetings; Status: Cancelled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6); Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS; Description: by CFO of the State of Florida obo Security National Ins Co

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 55.00; Final Amount: 55.00; Credits: -55.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5); Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL REMOTE SUMMONS ISSUED; Description: To SECURITY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY rtn to Ptf's Atty via e service for sop

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4); Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: Security National Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3); Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE; Description: CMO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2); Docket Type: COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1); Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less