This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 07/14/2022 at 21:34:53 (UTC).

CHAD TEDFORD V. KFC CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 03/31/2022 CHAD TEDFORD filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against KFC CORPORATION. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Kathryn Weston. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CIDL

  • Filing Date:

    03/31/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Kathryn Weston

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CHAD TEDFORD

RUE & ZIFFRA

Port Orange, FL 32127

Defendant

KFC CORPORATION

Plantation, FL 33324

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EDWARD S RUE

Rue & Ziffra, 632 Dunlawton Ave

Port Orange, FL 32127

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

03/31/2022 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

03/31/2022 : COMPLAINT

REQUEST SUMMONS

03/31/2022 : REQUEST SUMMONS

DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

03/31/2022 : DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

NOTICE OF SERVICE

03/31/2022 : NOTICE OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

03/31/2022 : NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

03/31/2022 : REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

03/31/2022 : REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

04/02/2022 : TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

05/02/2022 : RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

NOTICE OF DISMISSAL

06/29/2022 : NOTICE OF DISMISSAL

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

06/29/2022 : FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12); Docket Type: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11); Docket Type: NOTICE OF DISMISSAL; Description: w/prej by Chad Tedford Instrument: 2022155136 Book: 8277 Page: 2076 View: 2022155136

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10); Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED; Description: KFC Corp

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 400.00; Final Amount: 400.00; Credits: -400.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9); Docket Type: TWENTY DAY SUMMONS; Description: To KFC CORPORATION rtn to Ptf's Atty via e service for sop

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8); Docket Type: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Description: to KFC Corporation by Chad Tedford

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7); Docket Type: REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Description: to KFC Corporation by Chad Tedford

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6); Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Description: to KFC Corporation by Chad Tedford

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5); Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE; Description: CMO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4); Docket Type: DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS; Description: Edward S Rue Esq

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3); Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: KFC Corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2); Docket Type: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1); Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RUE & ZIFFRA is a litigant

Latest cases where KFC CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer EDWARD S RUE