Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 07/28/2020 at 01:41:59 (UTC).

CELESTE MOMIN V. BOARDWALK AT DAYTONA DEVELOPMENT LLC A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL, ETC.

Case Summary

On 02/06/2020 CELESTE MOMIN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BOARDWALK AT DAYTONA DEVELOPMENT LLC A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, , ETC. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Michael S. Orfinger. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CICI

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Volusia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Michael S. Orfinger

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CELESTE MOMIN

HOGAN & HOGAN P A

Defendants

HILDEBRAND RIDES INC A FLORIDA PROFIT CORPORATION

BOARDWALK AT DAYTONA DEVELOPMENT LLC A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

DAYTONA BEACH PARK AMUSEMENT RIDES INC A K A HILDEBRAND AMUSEMENT RIDES INC A FLORIDA PROFIT

Not Classified By Court

HILDEBRAND AMUSEMENT RIDES INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JEREMY L. HOGAN

906 E Michigan St

Orlando, FL 32806

Defendant Attorney

CHRISTOPHER C COLEMAN

Cameron Hodges Coleman Lapoint 150 S Palmetto Ave Ste 200

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

06/18/2020 : NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

CERTIFICATE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

06/11/2020 : CERTIFICATE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

06/04/2020 : NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

06/04/2020 : NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

NOTICE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

05/26/2020 : NOTICE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

NOTICE OF SERVICE

05/26/2020 : NOTICE OF SERVICE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

03/13/2020 : REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

03/13/2020 : NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

PROPOSED TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

02/13/2020 : PROPOSED TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

02/13/2020 : MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

02/13/2020 : TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

02/12/2020 : REQUEST SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

02/12/2020 : REQUEST SUMMONS

AMENDED MOTION/PETITION/COMPLAINT

02/12/2020 : AMENDED MOTION/PETITION/COMPLAINT

REQUEST SUMMONS

02/07/2020 : REQUEST SUMMONS

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/07/2020 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST SUMMONS

02/06/2020 : REQUEST SUMMONS

COMPLAINT

02/06/2020 : COMPLAINT

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) Docket Type: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY; Description: to Florida Hospital Centra Care et al

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Docket Type: CERTIFICATE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF; Description: Celeste Momin of non-objection and request for copies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Docket Type: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY; Description: to Durham Bus Services et al

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Docket Type: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY; Description: to Centra Care et al

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Docket Type: NOTICE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF; Description: Celeste Momin of privilege log

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Docket Type: RESPONSE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF; Description: Celeste Momin to Dfnt's request to produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE; Description: Pltf's verifed responses to Dfnt's interrogs by Celeste Momin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Docket Type: REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Description: to Celeste Momin by Boardwalk at Daytona Development LLC etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Description: to Celeste Momin by Boardwalk at Daytona Development LLC etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Docket Type: ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT; Description: Boardwalk at Daytona Development LLC & AFFIRM defenses & DEMAND for jury trial as to the amd complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: (as to amended complaint) to Boardwalk at daytona Development, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: AMENDED MOTION/PETITION/COMPLAINT; Description: dropping df Hildebrand Rides, Inc.; adding df Daytona Beach Park Amusement Rides Inc etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: TWENTY DAY SUMMONS; Description: To HILDEBRAND RIDES, INC., A FLORIDA PROFIT CORPORATION fwd to pltf atty by e-service for sop cc pltf atty by e-service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: TWENTY DAY SUMMONS; Description: To BOARDWALK AT DAYTONA DEVELOPMENT, LLC A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY fwd to pltf atty by e-service for sop cc pltf atty by e-service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 400.00; Final Amount: 400.00; Credits: -400.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • FinancialQuantity: 2; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 20.00; Credits: -20.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Hildebrand Rides Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET; Description: $500,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Boardwalk at Daytona Development LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DAYTONA BEACH LEASED HOUSING ASSOCIATES I LLLP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HOGAN, JEREMY L