This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 03/24/2020 at 18:10:31 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I LLC V. CRYSTAL JASON

Case Summary

On 06/19/2019 CAVALRY SPV I LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CRYSTAL JASON. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are David A. Cromartie and Christopher Kelly. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********COCI

  • Filing Date:

    06/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Volusia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

David A. Cromartie

Christopher Kelly

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CAVALRY SPV I LLC

HUNT & KAHN P A

Defendant

CRYSTAL JASON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JEFFREY L KAHN

Po Box 934788

Margate, FL 33093-4788

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF HEARING: INTENTION TO DISMISS

03/12/2020 : NOTICE OF HEARING: INTENTION TO DISMISS

NOTICE OF HEARING: INTENTION TO DISMISS

03/12/2020 : NOTICE OF HEARING: INTENTION TO DISMISS

NOTICE OF HEARING: INTENTION TO DISMISS

03/12/2020 : NOTICE OF HEARING: INTENTION TO DISMISS

CONTINUED FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS

07/18/2019 : CONTINUED FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS

RETURNED SUMMONS UNEXECUTED

07/12/2019 : RETURNED SUMMONS UNEXECUTED

ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

06/25/2019 : ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

06/21/2019 : PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

06/19/2019 : REQUEST SUMMONS

MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

06/19/2019 : MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

06/19/2019 : STATEMENT OF CLAIM

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/19/2019 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Lack of Prosecution Hearing; Court Officer: Christopher Kelly; Location: CI-7, City Island Courthouse; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Docket Type: NOTICE OF HEARING: INTENTION TO DISMISS; Description: Lack of Prosecution Hearing Notice for HUNT & KAHN P A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Docket Type: NOTICE OF HEARING: INTENTION TO DISMISS; Description: Lack of Prosecution Hearing Notice for CRYSTAL JASON.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Docket Type: NOTICE OF HEARING: INTENTION TO DISMISS; Description: Lack of Prosecution Hearing Notice for JEFFREY L KAHN, attorney for CAVALRY SPV I LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-Trial; Court Officer: David A. Cromartie; Location: CI-7, City Island Courthouse; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Docket Type: CONTINUED FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS UNEXECUTED; Description: Crystal Jason

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 175.00; Final Amount: 175.00; Credits: -175.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS; Description: To CRYSTAL JASON ret to atty via e service for SOP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Crystal Jason

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: NOTICE FOR REDACTION/CONFIDENTIALITY; Description: by Cavalry SPV I LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.; Description: by Cavalry SPV I LLC w/o Or

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less