Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 05/12/2020 at 12:52:45 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I LLC V. CHRISTINE A WIGGINS

Case Summary

On 02/06/2020 CAVALRY SPV I LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CHRISTINE A WIGGINS. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Angela A. Dempsey. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CODL

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Volusia County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Volusia County Courthouse Deland

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Angela A. Dempsey

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CAVALRY SPV I LLC

HUNT & KAHN PA

Defendant

CHRISTINE A WIGGINS

Port Orange, FL 32127-5802

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DERYL G HUNT

Attorney at HUNT & KAHN P A

P O Box 934788

Margate, FL 33093-4788

Defendant Attorney

SEBRINA L SLACK

Attorney at LAW FIRM OF WRIGHT & CASEY PA

340 N Causeway

New Smyrna Beach, FL 32169

 

Court Documents

ORDER APPROVING / AFFIRMING / CONFIRMING STIPULATION or SETTLEMENT

04/22/2020 : ORDER APPROVING / AFFIRMING / CONFIRMING STIPULATION or SETTLEMENT

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

04/20/2020 : FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

STIPULATION FOR/OF PAYMENT(S)

04/20/2020 : STIPULATION FOR/OF PAYMENT(S)

ORDER RESETTING / RESCHEDULING

04/03/2020 : ORDER RESETTING / RESCHEDULING

RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

03/27/2020 : RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

ORDER TO CONTINUE / CONTINUING

03/23/2020 : ORDER TO CONTINUE / CONTINUING

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

02/17/2020 : NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

02/13/2020 : ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

02/10/2020 : PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

02/06/2020 : REQUEST SUMMONS

MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

02/06/2020 : MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

02/06/2020 : STATEMENT OF CLAIM

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/06/2020 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/14/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-Trial; Court Officer: Angela A. Dempsey; Location: 1, DeLand; Status: Cancelled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-Trial; Court Officer: Angela A. Dempsey; Location: 1, DeLand; Status: Cancelled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Docket Type: ORDER APPROVING / AFFIRMING / CONFIRMING STIPULATION or SETTLEMENT; Description: w/o prej and Dismissing case Instrument: 2020078563 Book: 7846 Page: 220

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11.75) Docket Type: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11.5) Docket Type: STIPULATION FOR/OF PAYMENT(S); Description: agst Christine Wiggins Instrument: 2020078864 Book: 7846 Page: 1084

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Docket Type: ORDER RESETTING / RESCHEDULING; Description: (amd) P/T

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-Trial; Court Officer: Angela A. Dempsey; Location: 1, DeLand; Status: Cancelled; Comments: per order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED; Description: Christine A Wiggins

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Docket Type: ORDER TO CONTINUE / CONTINUING; Description: & reset 4/2/2020 pretrial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Description: Sebrina L Slack obo Christine A Wiggins

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 175.00; Final Amount: 175.00; Credits: -175.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS; Description: To CHRISTINE A WIGGINS fwd to pltfs atty & proc serv(Max) via e-service for sop

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Christine A Wiggins

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.; Description: by Cavalry SPV I LLC w/no prop order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: NOTICE FOR REDACTION/CONFIDENTIALITY; Description: by Cavalry SPV I LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HUNT & KAHN PA is a litigant

Latest cases where CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SEBRINA S SLACK