This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 07/30/2020 at 15:01:20 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF SYNCHRONY BANK V. VICTORIA CRUZ

Case Summary

On 09/25/2019 CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF SYNCHRONY BANK filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against VICTORIA CRUZ. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Christopher Kelly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********COCI

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Volusia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Christopher Kelly

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF SYNCHRONY BANK

ANDREU PALMA LAVIN & SOLIS PLLC

SYNCHRONY BANK

Defendant

VICTORIA CRUZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MELANIE S WESEMAN

Attorney at ANDREU PALMA LAVIN & SOLIS PLLC

887 Donald Ross Rd

Juno Beach, FL 33408

 

Court Documents

RETURNED SUMMONS UNEXECUTED

03/25/2020 : RETURNED SUMMONS UNEXECUTED

ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

03/24/2020 : ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

CONTINUED FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS

02/11/2020 : CONTINUED FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS

PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

01/14/2020 : PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

REQUEST FOR ALIAS SUMMONS

01/13/2020 : REQUEST FOR ALIAS SUMMONS

RETURNED SUMMONS UNEXECUTED

11/19/2019 : RETURNED SUMMONS UNEXECUTED

CONTINUED FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS

11/12/2019 : CONTINUED FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS

PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

10/02/2019 : PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

09/25/2019 : REQUEST SUMMONS

MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

09/25/2019 : MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

09/25/2019 : STATEMENT OF CLAIM

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/25/2019 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS UNEXECUTED; Description: Victoria Cruz

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Docket Type: ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-Trial; Court Officer: Christopher Kelly; Location: CI-7, City Island Courthouse; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Docket Type: CONTINUED FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS; Description: ALIAS To VICTORIA CRUZ fwd to pltfs atty/Max via eservice for SOP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Docket Type: REQUEST FOR ALIAS SUMMONS; Description: (alias) to Victoria Cruz

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS UNEXECUTED; Description: Victoria Cruz

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-Trial; Court Officer: Christopher Kelly; Location: CI-7, City Island Courthouse; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: CONTINUED FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS; Description: To VICTORIA CRUZ fwd to pltfs atty/Max via e-service for SOP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 175.00; Final Amount: 175.00; Credits: -175.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Victoria Cruz

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.; Description: by Cavalry SPV I, LLC etc w/out prop order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: NOTICE FOR REDACTION/CONFIDENTIALITY; Description: by Cavalry SPV I, LLC etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less