This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 06/25/2020 at 16:47:57 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK N A V. EDWARD C SCHULTZ

Case Summary

On 01/28/2020 CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK N A filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against EDWARD C SCHULTZ. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Christopher Kelly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********COCI

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Volusia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Christopher Kelly

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CITIBANK N A

HAYT HAYT & LANDAU P L

CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK N A

Defendant

EDWARD C SCHULTZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JASON S DRAGUTSKY

Attorney at HAYT HAYT & LANDAU P L

7765 Sw 87 Ave Ste 101

Miami, FL 33173

 

Court Documents

CONTINUED FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS

02/25/2020 : CONTINUED FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS

RETURNED SUMMONS UNEXECUTED

02/19/2020 : RETURNED SUMMONS UNEXECUTED

ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

02/07/2020 : ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

01/31/2020 : PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

01/28/2020 : REQUEST SUMMONS

MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

01/28/2020 : MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

COMPLAINT

01/28/2020 : COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-Trial; Court Officer: Christopher Kelly; Location: CI-7, City Island Courthouse; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: CONTINUED FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS UNEXECUTED; Description: Edward C Schultz

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 300.00; Final Amount: 300.00; Credits: -300.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS; Description: To EDWARD C SCHULTZ fwd to pltf's atty & process server (Max) via eservice for SOP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Edward C Schultz

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.; Description: by Cavalry SPV I, LLC etc w/o prop order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less