Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 10/14/2020 at 02:23:12 (UTC).

CATHY ANN DANIEL V. DOUGLAS H DANIEL

Case Summary

On 05/31/2019 CATHY ANN DANIEL filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against DOUGLAS H DANIEL. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Steven C. Henderson. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********FMCI

  • Filing Date:

    05/31/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Volusia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Steven C. Henderson

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CATHY ANN DANIEL

Respondent

DOUGLAS H DANIEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

ERIC NEITZKE

123 Live Oak Avenue

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

Respondent Attorney

PHILIP BONAMO

222 Seabreeze Blvd

Daytona Beach, FL 32118

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Docket Sounding; Court Officer: Steven C. Henderson; Location: SHZM, Zoom Meetings; Status: Cancelled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • Docket(#72) Docket Type: FINAL ORDER / JUDGMENT FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE; Description: w/att'd mediated MSA Instrument: 2020192730 Book: 7923 Page: 3106

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • Docket(#71) Docket Type: MOTION FOR JUDGMENT / FINAL JUDGMENT; Description: by pet w/att'd FL DL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • Docket(#70) Docket Type: AGREEMENT MARITAL SETTLEMENT; Description: mediated signed by both parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • Docket(#69) Docket Type: AMENDMENT/SUPPLEMENT TO; Description: ntc of taking depo of resp by pet **as to start time**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • Docket(#68) Docket Type: AMENDMENT/SUPPLEMENT TO; Description: ntc of taking depo on resp by pet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • Docket(#67) Docket Type: ORDER OF/FOR TRIAL; Description: & directing pre trial procedure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Docket Sounding; Court Officer: Steven C. Henderson; Location: City Island Courthouse; Status: Scheduled; Comments: via zoom

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • Docket(#66) Docket Type: HEARING SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • Docket(#65) Docket Type: AMENDMENT/SUPPLEMENT TO; Description: ntc of taking depo of resp

    Read MoreRead Less
65 More Docket Entries
  • 07/09/2019
  • Docket(#9) Docket Type: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Description: by atty Philip J Bonamo obo resp

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: NOTICE / ORDER FOR CASE MGMT CONF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 408.00; Final Amount: 408.00; Credits: -408.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: AMENDED MOTION/PETITION/COMPLAINT FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: CERTIFICATE DIST PARENTING NOTICE/STANDING ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: SUMMONS ISSUED; Description: as to PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE To DOUGLAS H DANIEL E-SERVED ORIG TO ATTORNEY FOR PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS; Description: by pet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BONAMO, PHILIP