This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 05/07/2023 at 16:03:51 (UTC).

MP LAKE FOREST LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY V. JERRY FREEMAN, ETC.

Case Summary

On 03/14/2023 MP LAKE FOREST LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against JERRY FREEMAN, ETC. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert A. Sanders, Jr.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********COCI

  • Filing Date:

    03/14/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Robert A. Sanders, Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MP LAKE FOREST LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

MGFD LAW FIRM PA

Defendants

JERRY FREEMAN

JERRY LEWIS FREEMAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WHITNEY H DALY

 

Court Documents

MAIL RETURNED FROM

04/11/2023 : MAIL RETURNED FROM

ORDER FOR DISBURSEMENT / DISTRIBUTION

04/11/2023 : ORDER FOR DISBURSEMENT / DISTRIBUTION

JUDGMENT OF/FOR POSSESSION

04/11/2023 : JUDGMENT OF/FOR POSSESSION

DEFAULT

04/11/2023 : DEFAULT

NOTICE OF DEPOSIT

04/10/2023 : NOTICE OF DEPOSIT

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

04/03/2023 : FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

MOTION BY/FOR DEFENDANT

04/03/2023 : MOTION BY/FOR DEFENDANT

MOTION FOR JUDGMENT / FINAL JUDGMENT

04/03/2023 : MOTION FOR JUDGMENT / FINAL JUDGMENT

AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE / VENUE

04/03/2023 : AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE / VENUE

RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

04/03/2023 : RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

NOTICE OF DEPOSIT

03/31/2023 : NOTICE OF DEPOSIT

MEMORANDUM BY JUDGE

03/31/2023 : MEMORANDUM BY JUDGE

DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

03/29/2023 : DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

NOTICE OF DEPOSIT

03/29/2023 : NOTICE OF DEPOSIT

ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

03/29/2023 : ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

03/24/2023 : CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

03/23/2023 : RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

FIVE DAY SUMMONS

03/15/2023 : FIVE DAY SUMMONS

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/11/2023
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 300.00; Final Amount: 300.00; Credits: -300.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 9.00; Final Amount: 9.00; Credits: -9.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21); Docket Type: MAIL RETURNED FROM; Description: Jerry Freeman aka Jerry Lewis Freeman

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20); Docket Type: ORDER FOR DISBURSEMENT / DISTRIBUTION; Description: MP Lake Forest LLC etc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19); Docket Type: JUDGMENT OF/FOR POSSESSION; Description: agst Jerry Freeman aka Jerry Lewis Freeman Instrument: 2023082362 Book: 8397 Page: 3349 View: 2023082362

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18); Docket Type: DEFAULT; Description: by judge as to Jerry Freeman aka Jerry Lewis Freeman

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17); Docket Type: NOTICE OF DEPOSIT; Description: of rent by Jerry Freeman $309.00 (rent $300.00 & clerk fee $9.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16); Docket Type: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15); Docket Type: MOTION BY/FOR DEFENDANT; Description: if judgment is entered by MP Lake Forest LLC etc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14); Docket Type: MOTION FOR JUDGMENT / FINAL JUDGMENT; Description: & default agst Jerry Freeman by MP Lake Forest LLC etc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 03/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8); Docket Type: NOTICE OF DEPOSIT; Description: by Jerry Freeman $1,022.50 ($1,000 rent & $22.50 clerk fee)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7); Docket Type: ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT; Description: Jerry Freeman w/ Request for hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6); Docket Type: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Description: summons and complaint to Jerry Freeman etc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5); Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED; Description: (5 day) Jerry Freeman aka Jerry Lewis Freeman

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 185.00; Final Amount: 185.00; Credits: -185.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4); Docket Type: FIVE DAY SUMMONS; Description: To JERRY FREEMAN, AKA JERRY LEWIS FREEMAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3); Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: To Jerry Lewis Freeman

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2); Docket Type: COMPLAINT FOR RESIDENTIAL EVICTION; Description: possession

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1); Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less