This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 06/14/2023 at 11:50:54 (UTC).

OCALA INJURY CLINIC LLC A A O MARY ADAMS STEPHENS V. STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 03/14/2023 OCALA INJURY CLINIC LLC A A O MARY ADAMS STEPHENS filed an Other lawsuit against STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Wesley Heidt. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********COCI

  • Filing Date:

    03/14/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Wesley Heidt

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

OCALA INJURY CLINIC LLC A A O MARY ADAMS STEPHENS

MARY ADAMS STEPHENS

KIMBERLY SIMOES P A

Defendant

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIMBERLY P SIMOES

Defendant Attorney

MICHOU PHENELUS

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

03/14/2023 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

03/14/2023 : COMPLAINT

REQUEST SUMMONS

03/14/2023 : REQUEST SUMMONS

NOTICE OF SERVICE

03/14/2023 : NOTICE OF SERVICE

PRE-TRIAL REMOTE SUMMONS ISSUED

03/24/2023 : PRE-TRIAL REMOTE SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

04/27/2023 : NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

05/24/2023 : ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

05/24/2023 : NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

MOTION FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME

05/24/2023 : MOTION FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2023
  • DocketSession Type: Case Management Conference; Court Officer: Wesley Heidt; Location: CI-7, City Island Courthouse; Status: Scheduled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9); Docket Type: MOTION FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME; Description: to respond to complaint by State Farm Mutual Automobile Ins Co

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8); Docket Type: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Description: Michou Phenelus Esq obo State Farm Mutual Automobile Ins Co w/email designation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7); Docket Type: ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT; Description: State Farm Mutual Automobile Ins Co w/affirm defenses & demand for Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-Trial; Court Officer: Wesley Heidt; Location: WHZM, Zoom Meetings; Status: Cancelled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6); Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS; Description: by CFO obo State Farm Mutual Automobile Ins Co

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5); Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL REMOTE SUMMONS ISSUED; Description: To STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY forwarded to plaintiff's attorney via e-service for SOP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 55.00; Final Amount: 55.00; Credits: -55.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4); Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE; Description: w/attached CMO by Ocala Injury Clinic etc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3); Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to State Farm Mutual etc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2); Docket Type: COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1); Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less