This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 04/23/2023 at 15:18:01 (UTC).

MP LAKE FOREST LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY V. RAJAHMAN WILLIAMS

Case Summary

On 03/14/2023 MP LAKE FOREST LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against RAJAHMAN WILLIAMS. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Wesley Heidt. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********COCI

  • Filing Date:

    03/14/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Wesley Heidt

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MP LAKE FOREST LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

MGFD LAW FIRM PA

Defendant

RAJAHMAN WILLIAMS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WHITNEY H DALY

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

03/14/2023 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FOR RESIDENTIAL EVICTION

03/14/2023 : COMPLAINT FOR RESIDENTIAL EVICTION

REQUEST SUMMONS

03/14/2023 : REQUEST SUMMONS

FIVE DAY SUMMONS

03/15/2023 : FIVE DAY SUMMONS

RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

03/23/2023 : RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

03/24/2023 : CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

03/28/2023 : ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

ORDER

04/03/2023 : ORDER

NOTICE OF DEPOSIT

04/04/2023 : NOTICE OF DEPOSIT

MOTION FOR JUDGMENT / FINAL JUDGMENT

04/04/2023 : MOTION FOR JUDGMENT / FINAL JUDGMENT

AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE / VENUE

04/04/2023 : AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE / VENUE

RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

04/04/2023 : RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

04/04/2023 : FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

ORDER OF/FOR HEARING

04/05/2023 : ORDER OF/FOR HEARING

ORDER OF/FOR HEARING

04/17/2023 : ORDER OF/FOR HEARING

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/15/2023
  • DocketSession Type: Non-Jury Trial; Court Officer: Wesley Heidt; Location: CI305, City Island Courthouse; Status: Scheduled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14); Docket Type: ORDER OF/FOR HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13); Docket Type: ORDER OF/FOR HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2023
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 2320.25; Final Amount: 2320.25; Credits: -2320.25; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2023
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 42.30; Final Amount: 42.30; Credits: -42.30; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12); Docket Type: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11); Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED; Description: as to Rajahman Williams

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10); Docket Type: AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE / VENUE; Description: as to Rajahman Williams

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9); Docket Type: MOTION FOR JUDGMENT / FINAL JUDGMENT; Description: by MP Lake Forest LLC etc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8); Docket Type: NOTICE OF DEPOSIT; Description: $2362.55 by Rajahman Willams ($2320.25 rent & $42.30 clerk fee)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7); Docket Type: ORDER; Description: No Further Action Will Be Taken; Dfnt has not alleged payment of rent as a defense.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6); Docket Type: ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT; Description: Rajahman Williams

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5); Docket Type: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Description: summons and complaint to Rajahman Williams

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4.5); Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED; Description: Rajahman Williams (5 day)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 185.00; Final Amount: 185.00; Credits: -185.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4); Docket Type: FIVE DAY SUMMONS; Description: To RAJAHMAN WILLIAMS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3); Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: To Rajahman Williams

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2); Docket Type: COMPLAINT FOR RESIDENTIAL EVICTION; Description: Possession

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1); Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less