This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 04/11/2020 at 14:45:24 (UTC).

CASCADE CAPITAL LLC ASSIGNEE OF SANTANDER CONSUMER USA INC V. CHERYL CAPDEVILLA

Case Summary

On 11/14/2019 CASCADE CAPITAL LLC ASSIGNEE OF SANTANDER CONSUMER USA INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CHERYL CAPDEVILLA. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Christopher Kelly. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********COCI

  • Filing Date:

    11/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Volusia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Christopher Kelly

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RAUSCH STURM

SANTANDER CONSUMER USA INC

CASCADE CAPITAL LLC ASSIGNEE OF SANTANDER CONSUMER USA INC

Defendant

CHERYL CAPDEVILLA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SARAH C DALEY

Rausch Sturm 5801 Ulmerton Rd Ste 201

Clearwater, FL 33760-3951

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF DISMISSAL

04/01/2020 : NOTICE OF DISMISSAL

CONTINUED FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS

12/10/2019 : CONTINUED FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS

RETURNED SUMMONS UNEXECUTED

12/03/2019 : RETURNED SUMMONS UNEXECUTED

ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

11/20/2019 : ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

11/18/2019 : PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

11/14/2019 : REQUEST SUMMONS

MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

11/14/2019 : MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

COMPLAINT

11/14/2019 : COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Docket Type: NOTICE OF DISMISSAL; Description: w/o prej by Cascade Capital LLC etc Instrument: 2020067429 Book: 7838 Page: 415

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-Trial; Court Officer: Christopher Kelly; Location: CI-7, City Island Courthouse; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: CONTINUED FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS UNEXECUTED; Description: Cheryl Capdevilla

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 300.00; Final Amount: 300.00; Credits: -300.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS; Description: To CHERYL CAPDEVILLA ret to atty via e service for SOP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Cheryl Capdevilla

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.; Description: by Cascade Capital etc w/o Or

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: NOTICE FOR REDACTION/CONFIDENTIALITY; Description: by Cascade Capital etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less