Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 07/15/2020 at 12:47:58 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK USA N A V. STEPHANIE D COPELAND

Case Summary

On 12/27/2019 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA N A filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against STEPHANIE D COPELAND. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Angela A. Dempsey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CODL

  • Filing Date:

    12/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Volusia County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Volusia County Courthouse Deland

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Angela A. Dempsey

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

POLLACK & ROSEN PA

CAPITAL ONE BANK USA N A

Defendant

STEPHANIE D COPELAND

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KEVIN SPINOZZA

Attorney at POLLACK & ROSEN P A

806 Douglas Road Suite 200

Coral Gables, FL 33134

 

Court Documents

RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

03/31/2020 : RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

03/17/2020 : ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

03/09/2020 : MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

03/09/2020 : PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

REQUEST FOR ALIAS SUMMONS

03/02/2020 : REQUEST FOR ALIAS SUMMONS

CONTINUED FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS

02/13/2020 : CONTINUED FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS

RETURNED SUMMONS UNEXECUTED

02/11/2020 : RETURNED SUMMONS UNEXECUTED

ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

01/14/2020 : ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

12/31/2019 : PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

12/27/2019 : REQUEST SUMMONS

AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE / VENUE

12/27/2019 : AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE / VENUE

MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

12/27/2019 : MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

12/27/2019 : DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

12/27/2019 : STATEMENT OF CLAIM

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/14/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-Trial; Court Officer: Angela A. Dempsey; Location: 1, DeLand; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED; Description: (alias) Stephanie D Copeland

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Docket Type: ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Docket Type: MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.; Description: by Capital One Bank NA *no prop Order*

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS; Description: ALIAS To STEPHANIE D COPELAND fwd to process server MAX for SOP; cc pltf's atty via eserve

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Docket Type: REQUEST FOR ALIAS SUMMONS; Description: to Stephanie D Copeland

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-Trial; Court Officer: Angela A. Dempsey; Location: 1, DeLand; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Docket Type: CONTINUED FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS UNEXECUTED; Description: Stephanie D Copeland

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 175.00; Final Amount: 175.00; Credits: -175.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS; Description: To STEPHANIE D COPELAND fwd to proc serv/sop (MAX) via e-service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: as to Stephanie D Copeland

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE / VENUE; Description: as to Stephanie D Copeland

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.; Description: by Capital One (no order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS; Description: Kevin Spinozza

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: NOTICE FOR REDACTION/CONFIDENTIALITY; Description: by Capital One

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where POLLACK AND ROSEN PA is a litigant

Latest cases where Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Spinozza, Kevin