This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 08/06/2020 at 00:53:20 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK USA N A V. RICHARD TABLINSKY

Case Summary

On 12/08/2019 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA N A filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against RICHARD TABLINSKY. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Dawn P. Fields. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********COCI

  • Filing Date:

    12/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Volusia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Dawn P. Fields

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

POLLACK & ROSEN

CAPITAL ONE BANK USA N A

Defendant

RICHARD TABLINSKY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KEVIN SPINOZZA

Attorney at POLLACK & ROSEN P A

806 Douglas Road Suite 200

Coral Gables, FL 33134

 

Court Documents

REQUEST SUMMONS

12/08/2019 : REQUEST SUMMONS

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

12/08/2019 : STATEMENT OF CLAIM

NOTICE FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE, ETC.

07/09/2020 : NOTICE FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE, ETC.

RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

06/05/2020 : RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

NOTICE OF/FOR NEW COURT DATE

05/22/2020 : NOTICE OF/FOR NEW COURT DATE

RETURNED SUMMONS UNUSED

05/16/2020 : RETURNED SUMMONS UNUSED

PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

05/06/2020 : PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

REQUEST FOR ALIAS SUMMONS

05/06/2020 : REQUEST FOR ALIAS SUMMONS

NOTICE OF/FOR NEW COURT DATE

04/29/2020 : NOTICE OF/FOR NEW COURT DATE

RETURNED SUMMONS UNEXECUTED

04/13/2020 : RETURNED SUMMONS UNEXECUTED

PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

03/10/2020 : PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

REQUEST FOR ALIAS SUMMONS

03/05/2020 : REQUEST FOR ALIAS SUMMONS

CONTINUED FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS

12/31/2019 : CONTINUED FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS

ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

12/12/2019 : ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

12/09/2019 : PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE / VENUE

12/08/2019 : AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE / VENUE

MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

12/08/2019 : MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

12/08/2019 : DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-Trial; Court Officer: Dawn P. Fields; Location: DFZM, Zoom Meetings; Status: Cancelled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Docket Type: NOTICE FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE, ETC.; Description: (Amd)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-Trial; Court Officer: Dawn P. Fields; Location: CI-10, City Island Courthouse; Status: Cancelled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS UNEXECUTED; Description: (Pluries)Richard Tablinsky

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Docket Type: NOTICE OF/FOR NEW COURT DATE; Description: Notice to parties that the hearing(s) previously scheduled on 6/9/2020 at 01:30p were rescheduled to 8/4/2020 at 10:30a in the original location (City Island Courthouse Annex, 125 E. Orange Avenue, Daytona Beach) with the original official

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS UNUSED; Description: Richard Tablinsky

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS; Description: PLURIES To RICHARD TABLINSKY fwd to pltf atty via e-service for SOP; cc pltf atty via e-service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Docket Type: REQUEST FOR ALIAS SUMMONS; Description: pluries, to Richard Tablinsky

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Docket Type: NOTICE OF/FOR NEW COURT DATE; Description: Notice to parties that the hearing(s) previously scheduled on 4/14/2020 at 09:00a were rescheduled to 6/9/2020 at 01:30p in the original location (City Island Courthouse Annex, 125 E. Orange Avenue, Daytona Beach) with the original official

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 300.00; Final Amount: 300.00; Credits: -300.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS; Description: To RICHARD TABLINSKY fwd to proc serv/sop (MAX) via e-service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: as to Richard Tablinsky

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE / VENUE; Description: as to Richard Tablinsky

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.; Description: by Capital One (no order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS; Description: Kevin Spinozza

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2019
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: NOTICE FOR REDACTION/CONFIDENTIALITY; Description: by Capital One

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less