Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 02/24/2020 at 21:47:55 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK USA N A V. KEVIN PROULX

Case Summary

On 07/13/2019 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA N A filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against KEVIN PROULX. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Christopher Kelly and Angela A. Dempsey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CODL

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Volusia County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Volusia County Courthouse Deland

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Christopher Kelly

Angela A. Dempsey

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CAPITAL ONE BANK USA N A

BROCK & SCOTT PLLC

Defendant

KEVIN PROULX

Longwood, FL 32779

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ELIZABETH M FERRELL

Attorney at BROCK & SCOTT PLLC

1315 Westbrook Plaza Dr

Winston-Salem North, CARO 27103

Defendant Attorney

KEVIN PROULX

195 Wekiva Springs Rd Ste 204

Longwood, FL 32779

 

Court Documents

DEFAULT

10/03/2019 : DEFAULT

COURT NOTES

10/03/2019 : COURT NOTES

ORDER FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE, ETC.

09/18/2019 : ORDER FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE, ETC.

NOTICE BY/FOR DEFENDANT

09/16/2019 : NOTICE BY/FOR DEFENDANT

NOTICE OF/FOR NEW COURT DATE

09/06/2019 : NOTICE OF/FOR NEW COURT DATE

RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

08/21/2019 : RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

ORDER TO CONTINUE / CONTINUING

08/20/2019 : ORDER TO CONTINUE / CONTINUING

MOTION TO CONTINUE / CONTINUING

08/19/2019 : MOTION TO CONTINUE / CONTINUING

ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

08/06/2019 : ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

07/15/2019 : PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

07/13/2019 : REQUEST SUMMONS

MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

07/13/2019 : MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

COMPLAINT

07/13/2019 : COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/13/2019 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2019
  • HearingSession Type: Pre-Trial; Court Officer: Angela A. Dempsey; Location: 1, DeLand; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Docket Type: DEFAULT; Description: as to Kevin Proulx

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Docket Type: COURT NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • HearingSession Type: Pre-Trial; Court Officer: Christopher Kelly; Location: 1, DeLand; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Docket Type: ORDER FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE, ETC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Docket Type: NOTICE BY/FOR DEFENDANT; Description: Kevin Proulx Esq of conflict and mtn to continue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Docket Type: NOTICE OF/FOR NEW COURT DATE; Description: Notice to parties that the hearing(s) previously scheduled on 9/5/2019 at 09:00a were rescheduled to 9/19/2019 at 09:00a in the original location (DeLand Courthouse, 101 N. Alabama Avenue) with the original official (CK).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • HearingSession Type: Pre-Trial; Court Officer: Christopher Kelly; Location: 1, DeLand; Status: Cancelled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • HearingSession Type: Pre-Trial; Court Officer: Christopher Kelly; Location: 1, DeLand; Status: Cancelled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED; Description: Kevin Proulx

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: ORDER TO CONTINUE / CONTINUING; Description: Pretrial Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: MOTION TO CONTINUE / CONTINUING; Description: Pretrial & Notice of Conflict by Kevin Proulx,Esq

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 300.00; Final Amount: 300.00; Credits: -300.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS; Description: To KEVIN PROULX fwd to pltf atty by e-service for sop cc pltf atty by e-service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Kevin Proulx

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.; Description: by Capital One Bank (USA) N.A. w/out prop order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BROCK & SCOTT PLLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FERRELL, ELIZABETH MURANTE