Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 10/20/2020 at 09:02:53 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK USA N A V. JEANETTE M TELLIS

Case Summary

On 01/27/2020 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA N A filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JEANETTE M TELLIS. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Dawn P. Fields. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********COCI

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Volusia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Dawn P. Fields

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

POLLACK & ROSEN PA

CAPITAL ONE BANK USA N A

Defendant

JEANETTE M TELLIS

Daytona Beach, FL 32117-4280

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KEVIN SPINOZZA

Attorney at POLLACK & ROSEN P A

806 Douglas Road Suite 200

Coral Gables, FL 33134

 

Court Documents

HEARING SHEET

08/04/2020 : HEARING SHEET

NOTICE FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE, ETC.

07/08/2020 : NOTICE FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE, ETC.

NOTICE OF/FOR NEW COURT DATE

05/22/2020 : NOTICE OF/FOR NEW COURT DATE

RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

04/27/2020 : RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

04/14/2020 : PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

REQUEST FOR ALIAS SUMMONS

04/07/2020 : REQUEST FOR ALIAS SUMMONS

CONTINUED FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS

03/03/2020 : CONTINUED FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS

RETURNED SUMMONS UNEXECUTED

02/29/2020 : RETURNED SUMMONS UNEXECUTED

ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

02/10/2020 : ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

01/29/2020 : PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

01/27/2020 : REQUEST SUMMONS

MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

01/27/2020 : MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

01/27/2020 : DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE / VENUE

01/27/2020 : AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE / VENUE

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

01/27/2020 : STATEMENT OF CLAIM

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-Trial; Court Officer: Dawn P. Fields; Location: DFZM, Zoom Meetings; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Docket Type: HEARING SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Docket Type: NOTICE FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE, ETC.; Description: (Amd)via zoom

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-Trial; Court Officer: Dawn P. Fields; Location: CI-10, City Island Courthouse; Status: Cancelled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Docket Type: NOTICE OF/FOR NEW COURT DATE; Description: Notice to parties that the hearing(s) previously scheduled on 6/9/2020 at 09:00a were rescheduled to 8/4/2020 at 08:30a in the original location (City Island Courthouse Annex, 125 E. Orange Avenue, Daytona Beach) with the original official

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED; Description: (Alias) Jeanette M Tellis

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS; Description: ALIAS To JEANETTE M TELLIS Fwd to pltf atty via e-service for SOP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Docket Type: REQUEST FOR ALIAS SUMMONS; Description: to Jeanette M Tellis

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-Trial; Court Officer: Dawn P. Fields; Location: CI-10, City Island Courthouse; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 300.00; Final Amount: 300.00; Credits: -300.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS; Description: To JEANETTE M TELLIS fwd to pltf atty via e-service for sop; cc pltf atty via e-service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Jeanette M Tellis

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.; Description: by Capital One Bank (USA) NA w/no proposed order atchd

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: NOTICE FOR REDACTION/CONFIDENTIALITY; Description: by Capital One Bank (USA) NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS; Description: by Kevin Spinozza, Esq

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE / VENUE; Description: as to Jeanette M Tellis

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where POLLACK AND ROSEN PA is a litigant

Latest cases where Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Spinozza, Kevin