This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 08/03/2022 at 15:30:19 (UTC).

CALIBER HOME LOANS INC V. RICHARD G POPE III, ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/17/2022 CALIBER HOME LOANS INC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against RICHARD G POPE III. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Mary G. Jolley. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CICI

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Mary G. Jolley

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CALIBER HOME LOANS INC

ROBERTSON ANSCHUTZ SCHNEID CRANE & PARTNERS PLLC

Boca Raton, FL 33487

Defendants

RICHARD G POPE III

Holly Hill, FL 32117

SHANAE DANIELS POPE

Holly Hill, FL 32117

COUNTY OF VOLUSIA FLORIDA

Deland, FL 32720

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTING ON BEHALF OF THE SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT

Tampa, FL 33602

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CAN GUNER

Attorney at ROBERTSON ANSCHUTZ SCHNEID CRANE & PARTNERS PLLC

6409 Congress Ave Ste 100

Boca Raton, FL 33487

Defendant Attorney

JOHN F RUDY III

400 N Tampa St Ste 3200

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

07/05/2022 : ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

DISCLAIMER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

06/30/2022 : DISCLAIMER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

06/29/2022 : CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

SIXTY DAY (USA) SUMMONS

06/21/2022 : SIXTY DAY (USA) SUMMONS

TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

06/21/2022 : TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

06/21/2022 : TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

06/21/2022 : TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

06/17/2022 : REQUEST SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

06/17/2022 : REQUEST SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

06/17/2022 : REQUEST SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

06/17/2022 : REQUEST SUMMONS

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

06/17/2022 : CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

06/17/2022 : MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

CERTIFICATE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

06/17/2022 : CERTIFICATE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

06/17/2022 : NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

WORKSHEET

06/17/2022 : WORKSHEET

COMPLAINT / PETITION TO FORECLOSE

06/17/2022 : COMPLAINT / PETITION TO FORECLOSE

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/17/2022 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18); Docket Type: ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17); Docket Type: DISCLAIMER BY/FOR DEFENDANT; Description: USA obo US Dept of Housing and Urban Development

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16); Docket Type: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE; Description: of CMO by Caliber Home Loans Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 905.00; Final Amount: 905.00; Credits: -905.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 4; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 40.00; Credits: -40.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 5.00; Final Amount: 5.00; Credits: -5.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 4.00; Final Amount: 4.00; Credits: -4.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 2; Unit Amount: 1.00; Final Amount: 2.00; Credits: -2.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15); Docket Type: SIXTY DAY (USA) SUMMONS; Description: To UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTING ON BEHALF OF THE SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT fwd to pltfs atty/proc server (Max) via eservice for SOP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14); Docket Type: TWENTY DAY SUMMONS; Description: To COUNTY OF VOLUSIA FLORIDA fwd to pltfs atty/proc server (Max) via eservice for SOP

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10); Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to County of Volusia Florida

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9); Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Shanae Daniels Pope

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8); Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Richard G Pope III

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7); Docket Type: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6); Docket Type: MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.; Description: by Caliber Home Loans Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5); Docket Type: CERTIFICATE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF; Description: Caliber Home Loans Inc of possession of original note

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4); Docket Type: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS; Description: Instrument: 2022147198 Book: 8272 Page: 3344 View: 2022147198

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3); Docket Type: WORKSHEET; Description: real property

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2); Docket Type: COMPLAINT / PETITION TO FORECLOSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1); Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ROBERTSON ANSCHUTZ SCHNEID CRANE & PARTNERS PLLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Unite States of America Dept of Treasury is a litigant

Latest cases where Caliber Home Loans, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JOHN F RUDY, III