This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 02/12/2020 at 22:30:39 (UTC).

C L O MGT LLC, ET AL V. GLORIA VAZQUES, ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/13/2020 C L O MGT LLC, filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against GLORIA VAZQUES,. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Christopher Kelly. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********COCI

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Christopher Kelly

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

C L O MGT LLC

JEFF ALDOUS

Defendant

GLORIA VAZQUES

Not Classified By Court

ALL OTHERS IN POSSESSION

 

Court Documents

DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

01/13/2020 : DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

NOTICE AUTHORIZING

01/13/2020 : NOTICE AUTHORIZING

ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

01/21/2020 : ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

COMPLAINT

01/13/2020 : COMPLAINT

RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

01/17/2020 : RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

01/15/2020 : CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

01/15/2020 : TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

STIPULATION FOR/OF PAYMENT(S)

02/04/2020 : STIPULATION FOR/OF PAYMENT(S)

RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

01/17/2020 : RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2020
  • HearingSession Type: Non-Jury Trial; Court Officer: Christopher Kelly; Location: CI305, City Island Courthouse; Status: Scheduled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Docket Type: PREVIOUSLY FILED THROUGH PORTAL; Description: Stipulation for Payments

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Docket Type: ORDER APPROVING / AFFIRMING / CONFIRMING STIPULATION or SETTLEMENT; Description: Instrument: 2020026881 Book: 7811 Page: 3572

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Docket Type: STIPULATION FOR/OF PAYMENT(S); Description: ast Gloria Vazques Instrument: 2020026877 Book: 7811 Page: 3568

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Docket Type: NOTICE OF/FOR MEDIATION/ARBITRATION; Description: before County Court Mediation Services

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Docket Type: MEMORANDUM BY JUDGE; Description: Court reviewed answer; schedule for NJT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Docket Type: ORDER OF/FOR TRIAL; Description: & Mediation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Docket Type: CLERK'S CERTIFICATE; Description: of Answer but No Payment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Docket Type: ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT; Description: by Tishana Quinteros; request for hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED; Description: All others in possession (20day)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 01/14/2020
  • FinancialQuantity: 4; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 40.00; Credits: -40.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 3.50; Final Amount: 3.50; Credits: -3.50; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • FinancialQuantity: 10; Unit Amount: 0.15; Final Amount: 1.50; Credits: -1.50; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: NOTICE AUTHORIZING; Description: by Cheri Evans

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE / VENUE; Description: as to Gloria Vazques

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: CONSENT BY/FOR PLAINTIFF; Description: CLO Mgt LLC etc to close case after 90 days of inactivity

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS; Description: by Cheri Evans

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: COMPLAINT; Description: poss/$1500.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: INFORMATION SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less