This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 09/04/2021 at 13:07:00 (UTC).

BRIDGECREST ACCEPTANCE CORP AS SERVICER FOR CARVANA LLC V. KEVIN MARVIN SZKOLNIK

Case Summary

On 08/05/2021 BRIDGECREST ACCEPTANCE CORP AS SERVICER FOR CARVANA LLC filed a Property - Repossession lawsuit against KEVIN MARVIN SZKOLNIK. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is A. Christian Miller. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CODL

  • Filing Date:

    08/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Repossession

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

A. Christian Miller

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BRIDGECREST ACCEPTANCE CORP AS SERVICER FOR CARVANA LLC

CARVANA LLC

GHIDOTTI BERGER LLP

Defendant

KEVIN MARVIN SZKOLNIK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JASON L DUGGAR

Attorney at GHIDOTTI BERGER LLP

1031 N Miami Beach Blvd

North Miami Beach, FL 33162

 

Court Documents

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ISSUED

08/27/2021 : ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ISSUED

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

08/27/2021 : ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

08/26/2021 : TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

CIVIL COVER SHEET

08/24/2021 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST SUMMONS

08/05/2021 : REQUEST SUMMONS

COMPLAINT OF/FOR REPLEVIN

08/05/2021 : COMPLAINT OF/FOR REPLEVIN

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketSession Type: Show Cause Hearing; Court Officer: A. Christian Miller; Location: Zoom Meetings; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ISSUED; Description: to Kevin Marvin Szkolnik fwd to pltfs atty by mail for SOP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; Description: to Kevin Marvin Szkolnik

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: TWENTY DAY SUMMONS; Description: To KEVIN MARVIN SZKOLNIK fwd to pltfs atty via eservice for SOP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 400.00; Final Amount: 400.00; Credits: -400.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 85.00; Final Amount: 85.00; Credits: -85.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Kevin Marvin Szkolnik

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: COMPLAINT OF/FOR REPLEVIN

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE LAW OFFICES OF GHIDOTTI/BERGER LLP is a litigant

Latest cases where BRIDGECREST ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION, A CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Carvana LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Duggar, Jason