This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 05/21/2023 at 04:07:00 (UTC).

BRENDAN MASTERSON V. DOUGLAS BRIAN MAIZEL

Case Summary

On 11/21/2022 BRENDAN MASTERSON filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against DOUGLAS BRIAN MAIZEL. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Dennis Craig. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CICI

  • Filing Date:

    11/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Dennis Craig

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BRENDAN MASTERSON

GEE & LEE PLLC

Defendant

DOUGLAS BRIAN MAIZEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

IMANI J WATERS

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

11/21/2022 : COMPLAINT

REQUEST SUMMONS

11/21/2022 : REQUEST SUMMONS

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/14/2022 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

12/20/2022 : TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

AMENDED MOTION/PETITION/COMPLAINT

02/23/2023 : AMENDED MOTION/PETITION/COMPLAINT

REQUEST SUMMONS

02/23/2023 : REQUEST SUMMONS

TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

03/08/2023 : TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2023
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7); Docket Type: TWENTY DAY SUMMONS; Description: as to AMENDED complaint To DOUGLAS BRIAN MAIZEL forwarded to plaintiff's attorney via e-service for SOP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6); Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: To Douglas Brian Maizel as to Amended Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5); Docket Type: AMENDED MOTION/PETITION/COMPLAINT; Description: no change go case style

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4); Docket Type: TWENTY DAY SUMMONS; Description: To DOUGLAS BRIAN MAIZEL Fwd to Pltfs Atty via eservice for sop

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3); Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 400.00; Final Amount: 400.00; Credits: -400.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2); Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Douglas Brian Maizel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1); Docket Type: COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less