Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 02/03/2020 at 22:49:50 (UTC).

BMS HOLDINGS LLC V. LEYMIT SIO, ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/13/2019 BMS HOLDINGS LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against LEYMIT SIO. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Christopher Kelly. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********COCI

  • Filing Date:

    12/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Volusia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Christopher Kelly

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MOREY LAW FIRM PA

BMS HOLDINGS LLC

Defendant

LEYMIT SIO

Not Classified By Court

ALL OTHER PERSONS IN POSSESSION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROBERTO M VAZQUEZ

Attorney at MOREY LAW FIRM P A

250 N Orange Ave Ste 1220

Orlando, FL 32801

 

Court Documents

FINAL ORDER / JUDGMENT OF/FOR POSSESSION

01/28/2020 : FINAL ORDER / JUDGMENT OF/FOR POSSESSION

AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE / VENUE

01/17/2020 : AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE / VENUE

MOTION FOR JUDGMENT / FINAL JUDGMENT

01/17/2020 : MOTION FOR JUDGMENT / FINAL JUDGMENT

DEFAULT

01/07/2020 : DEFAULT

MOTION OF/FOR DEFAULT

01/06/2020 : MOTION OF/FOR DEFAULT

RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

12/24/2019 : RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

12/24/2019 : RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

12/16/2019 : CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

12/16/2019 : CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

FIVE DAY SUMMONS

12/16/2019 : FIVE DAY SUMMONS

FIVE DAY SUMMONS

12/16/2019 : FIVE DAY SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

12/13/2019 : REQUEST SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

12/13/2019 : REQUEST SUMMONS

COMPLAINT

12/13/2019 : COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/13/2019 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Docket Type: FINAL ORDER / JUDGMENT OF/FOR POSSESSION; Description: agst Leymit Sio & All Other Persons Instrument: 2020021386 Book: 7808 Page: 2903

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Docket Type: AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE / VENUE; Description: as to Leymit Sio and All Other Persons in Possession

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Docket Type: MOTION FOR JUDGMENT / FINAL JUDGMENT; Description: by BMS Holdings LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Docket Type: DEFAULT; Description: as to Leymit Sio & All Other Persons in Possession

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Docket Type: MOTION OF/FOR DEFAULT; Description: as to Leymit Sio & All Other Persons in Possession w/prop default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED; Description: All Other Persons in Possession

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED; Description: Leymit Sio

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 185.00; Final Amount: 185.00; Credits: -185.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • FinancialQuantity: 2; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 20.00; Credits: -20.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • FinancialQuantity: 2; Unit Amount: 5.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Description: complaint and summons to Leymit Sio

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Description: complaint and summons to ALL OTHER PERSONS IN POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: FIVE DAY SUMMONS; Description: To ALL OTHER PERSONS IN POSSESSION fwd to pltf atty via e-service for sop; cc pltf atty via e-service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: FIVE DAY SUMMONS; Description: To LEYMIT SIO fwd to pltf atty via e-service for sop; cc pltf atty via e-service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to All Other Persons in Possession

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Leymit Sio

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: COMPLAINT; Description: (Possession)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BMS HOLDINGS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VAZQUEZ ROBERTO M