This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 06/11/2022 at 18:49:57 (UTC).

BETH THOMPSON, ETC. V. ANGELA VAN ALLEN, ET AL, ETC.

Case Summary

On 05/11/2022 BETH THOMPSON, ETC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against ANGELA VAN ALLEN, , ETC. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Randell H. Rowe, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CIDL

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Randell H. Rowe, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BETH THOMPSON

KINSEY VINCENT PYLE P L

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

Defendants

ANGELA VAN ALLEN

Etna, OH 43068-1403

SARA TACKETT

Columbus, OH 43207-3827

SARA LEE CHAVIS

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ON BEHALF OF THE ADMINISTRATOR OF THE SMALL BUSINESS ADMINISTRATION

Tampa, FL 33602

ADMINISTRATOR OF THE SMALL BUSINESS ADMINISTRATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JAMES PICKENS

Attorney at KINSEY VINCENT PYLE P L

150 S Palmetto Ave Ste 300

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/11/2022 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT TO PARTITION PROPERTY

05/11/2022 : COMPLAINT TO PARTITION PROPERTY

WORKSHEET

05/11/2022 : WORKSHEET

REQUEST SUMMONS

05/11/2022 : REQUEST SUMMONS

TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

05/11/2022 : TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

05/11/2022 : TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

SIXTY DAY (USA) SUMMONS

05/11/2022 : SIXTY DAY (USA) SUMMONS

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

05/17/2022 : NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

05/17/2022 : MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

05/19/2022 : ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Docket Type: ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 5.00; Final Amount: 5.00; Credits: -5.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 4.00; Final Amount: 4.00; Credits: -4.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 2; Unit Amount: 1.00; Final Amount: 2.00; Credits: -2.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Docket Type: MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.; Description: by Beth Thompson etc w/o prop order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS; Description: Instrument: 2022120805 Book: 8256 Page: 3409

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 400.00; Final Amount: 400.00; Credits: -400.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 3; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 30.00; Credits: -30.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: SIXTY DAY (USA) SUMMONS; Description: To UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ON BEHALF OF THE ADMINISTRATOR OF THE SMALL BUSINESS ADMINISTRATION w/ CMO att'd fwd to pltf's atty via eservice for SOP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: TWENTY DAY SUMMONS; Description: To SARA TACKETT, A/K/A SARA LEE CHAVIS w/ CMO att'd fwd to pltf's atty via eservice for SOP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: TWENTY DAY SUMMONS; Description: To ANGELA VAN ALLEN w/ CMO att'd fwd to pltf's atty via eservice for SOP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Angela Van Allen et al etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: WORKSHEET; Description: for Real Property

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: COMPLAINT TO PARTITION PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ADMINISTRATOR SMALL BUSINESS ADMINISTRATION UNITED STATES AM is a litigant

Latest cases where Unite States of America Dept of Treasury is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JAMES PICKENS