This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 03/09/2023 at 10:04:08 (UTC).

BERNADINE SAPINOSO, ET AL V. KB HOME, ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/17/2022 BERNADINE SAPINOSO, filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against KB HOME,. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Mary G. Jolley. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CICI

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Mary G. Jolley

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BERNADINE SAPINOSO

FRANCIS JOEL SAPINOSO

FLORIN ROEBIG P A

Palm Harbor, FL 34683

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

KB HOME

Wilmington, DE 19808

KB HOME FLORIDA LLC

Tallahassee, FL 32301

KB HOME GOLD COAST LLC

Tallahassee, FL 32301

AMERICAN LATHING OF NORTH FLORIDA INC

San Mateo, FL 32187

Cross Defendant and Defendant

AMERICAN LATHING OF NORTH FLORIDA INC

San Mateo, FL 32187

3Rd Party Plaintiff

KB GOLD COAST LLC

3Rd Party Defendant

M&D PROFESSIONAL PAINTING INC

St Cloud, FL 34772

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LUCA G ESPOSITO

Attorney at FLORIN ROEBIG P A

777 Alderman Road

Palm Harbor, FL 34683

Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and 3Rd Party Plaintiff Attorney

KATHERINE HECKERT

Attorney at CARLTON FIELDS PA

Po Box 3239

Tampa, FL 33601-3239

 

Court Documents

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

01/09/2023 : FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

NOTICE OF/FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

01/09/2023 : NOTICE OF/FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF SERVICE

12/30/2022 : AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

11/03/2022 : NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

10/28/2022 : ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

09/30/2022 : RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

09/16/2022 : RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

09/16/2022 : RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

CROSS-CLAIM SUMMONS

09/14/2022 : CROSS-CLAIM SUMMONS

THIRD PARTY SUMMONS

09/14/2022 : THIRD PARTY SUMMONS

MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

09/12/2022 : MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

REQUEST SUMMONS

09/12/2022 : REQUEST SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

09/12/2022 : REQUEST SUMMONS

ANSWER AND CROSS CLAIM

09/12/2022 : ANSWER AND CROSS CLAIM

RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

08/25/2022 : RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

08/22/2022 : TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

08/22/2022 : TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

08/22/2022 : TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26); Docket Type: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25); Docket Type: NOTICE OF/FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Description: w/prej by Bernadine Sapinoso and Francis Joel Sapinoso Instrument: 2023011264 Book: 8358 Page: 1533 View: 2023011264

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24); Docket Type: AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF SERVICE; Description: of summons,complaint,deft's answers w/affirm defenses and cross claim and 3rd party complaint w/exhibits to American Lathing of North Florida Inc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23); Docket Type: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT; Description: by Bernadine Sapinoso et al

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22); Docket Type: ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21); Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED; Description: (3rd party) M & D Professional Painting Inc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20); Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED; Description: KB Home Gold Coast LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19); Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED; Description: KB Home Florida LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 395.00; Final Amount: 395.00; Credits: -395.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 2; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 20.00; Credits: -20.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10); Docket Type: TWENTY DAY SUMMONS; Description: To KB HOME GOLD COAST LLC Frwd to Pltf's Atty via e-service for SOP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9); Docket Type: TWENTY DAY SUMMONS; Description: To KB HOME FLORIDA LLC Frwd to Pltf's Atty via e-service for SOP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8); Docket Type: TWENTY DAY SUMMONS; Description: To KB HOME Frwd to Pltf's Atty via e-service for SOP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7); Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: To American Lathing of North FL Inc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6); Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: To KB Home Gold Coast LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5); Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: To KB Home FL LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4); Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: To KB Home

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3); Docket Type: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2); Docket Type: COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1); Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less