This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 05/11/2020 at 09:52:14 (UTC).

BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE V. KYMBROUGH L ZURSTADT

Case Summary

On 01/24/2020 BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against KYMBROUGH L ZURSTADT. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Dawn P. Fields. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********COCI

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Volusia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Dawn P. Fields

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ANDREU PALMA LAVIN & SOLIS PLLC

BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE

Defendant

KYMBROUGH L ZURSTADT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JORGE L PALMA

Andreu Palma Lavin & Solis 815 Nw 57Th Avenue Ste 401

Miami, FL 33126-2363

 

Court Documents

ORDER APPROVING / AFFIRMING / CONFIRMING STIPULATION or SETTLEMENT

04/16/2020 : ORDER APPROVING / AFFIRMING / CONFIRMING STIPULATION or SETTLEMENT

MOTION BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

04/16/2020 : MOTION BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

STIPULATION FOR/OF PAYMENT(S)

04/08/2020 : STIPULATION FOR/OF PAYMENT(S)

STIPULATION FOR/OF PAYMENT(S)

04/08/2020 : STIPULATION FOR/OF PAYMENT(S)

CONTINUED FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS

03/03/2020 : CONTINUED FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS

RETURNED SUMMONS UNEXECUTED

02/26/2020 : RETURNED SUMMONS UNEXECUTED

ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

01/30/2020 : ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

01/28/2020 : PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

01/24/2020 : REQUEST SUMMONS

MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

01/24/2020 : MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE / VENUE

01/24/2020 : AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE / VENUE

COMPLAINT

01/24/2020 : COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Docket Type: ORDER APPROVING / AFFIRMING / CONFIRMING STIPULATION or SETTLEMENT; Description: Instrument: 2020078111 Book: 7845 Page: 3635

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Docket Type: MOTION BY/FOR PLAINTIFF; Description: Barclays Bank Delaware, for approval of settlement stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Docket Type: STIPULATION FOR/OF PAYMENT(S); Description: agst Kymbrough L Zurstadt Instrument: 2020072924 Book: 7841 Page: 4386

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Docket Type: STIPULATION FOR/OF PAYMENT(S); Description: agst Kymbrough L Zurstadt Instrument: 2020072923 Book: 7841 Page: 4383

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-Trial; Court Officer: Dawn P. Fields; Location: CI-10, City Island Courthouse; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Docket Type: CONTINUED FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS UNEXECUTED; Description: Kymbrough L Zurstadt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 300.00; Final Amount: 300.00; Credits: -300.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS; Description: To KYMBROUGH L ZURSTADT fwd to pltfs atty/Max via eservice for SOP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Kymbrough L Zurstadt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.; Description: by Barclays Bank Delaware w/o prop order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE / VENUE; Description: as to Kymbrough L Zurstadt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: NOTICE FOR REDACTION/CONFIDENTIALITY; Description: by Barclays Bank Delaware

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less