Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 07/07/2020 at 11:43:52 (UTC).

BANK OF THE WEST A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION V. MARY L WHITE

Case Summary

On 11/19/2019 BANK OF THE WEST A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MARY L WHITE. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Kathryn Weston. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CIDL

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Volusia County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Volusia County Courthouse Deland

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Kathryn Weston

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SPRECHMAN & FISHER P A

BANK OF THE WEST A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendant

MARY L WHITE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STACEY S FISHER

2775 Sunny Isles Blvd Ste 100

Miami, FL 33160

 

Court Documents

DEFAULT

02/27/2020 : DEFAULT

AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE / VENUE

02/25/2020 : AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE / VENUE

MOTION OF/FOR DEFAULT

02/25/2020 : MOTION OF/FOR DEFAULT

NOTICE / ORDER OF CANCELING OF/FOR HEARING

02/18/2020 : NOTICE / ORDER OF CANCELING OF/FOR HEARING

RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

02/14/2020 : RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

PROPOSED OF/FOR DEFAULT

02/10/2020 : PROPOSED OF/FOR DEFAULT

AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE / VENUE

01/30/2020 : AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE / VENUE

MOTION OF/FOR DEFAULT

01/30/2020 : MOTION OF/FOR DEFAULT

AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF SERVICE

01/02/2020 : AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF SERVICE

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

11/25/2019 : ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

11/22/2019 : ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

11/19/2019 : TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

11/19/2019 : REQUEST SUMMONS

PROPOSED

11/19/2019 : PROPOSED

MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

11/19/2019 : MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

COMPLAINT

11/19/2019 : COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/19/2019 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Docket Type: DEFAULT; Description: as to Mary L White

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Docket Type: AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE / VENUE; Description: as to Mary L White

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Docket Type: MOTION OF/FOR DEFAULT; Description: as to Mary L White

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Show Cause Hearing; Court Officer: Kathryn Weston; Location: D-413, DeLand; Status: Cancelled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Docket Type: NOTICE / ORDER OF CANCELING OF/FOR HEARING; Description: by Bank of the West etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED; Description: Mary L White

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • Docket(#13) Docket Type: COPY OF LETTER; Description: to Sprechman & Fisher PA by clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Docket Type: PROPOSED OF/FOR DEFAULT; Description: default can't be entered no proof of svc filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Docket Type: AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE / VENUE; Description: as to Mary L White

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Docket Type: MOTION OF/FOR DEFAULT; Description: as to Mary L White

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; Description: to Mary L White

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 400.00; Final Amount: 400.00; Credits: -400.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: TWENTY DAY SUMMONS; Description: To MARY L WHITE ret to atty via e service for SOP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Mary L White

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: PROPOSED; Description: OTSC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.; Description: by Bank of the West etc w/o Or

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: COMPLAINT; Description: & Replevin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sprechman & Fisher (PA) is a litigant

Latest cases where BANK OF THE WEST is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Fisher, Stacey S, ESQ.