This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 09/30/2021 at 18:38:15 (UTC).

BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON, ETC. V. SUSAN R COBB, ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/17/2009 BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON, ETC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against SUSAN R COBB,. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Leah R. Case and Richard S. Graham. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CICI

  • Filing Date:

    11/17/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Leah R. Case

Richard S. Graham

 

Party Details

Defendants

HERITAGE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

Ormond Beach, FL 32176

UNKNOWN TENANT NO 1

Holly Hill, FL 32117

SPACE COAST CREDIT UNION

Cocoa Beach, FL 32931

UNKNOWN TENANT SPOUSE HEIR ETC

UNKNOWN TENANT NO 2

Holly Hill, FL 32117

Trustee

BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

1St Party Defendant

SUSAN R COBB

Holly Hill, FL 321173

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

D SCOTT BAKER

Zimmerman Kiser & Sutcliffe, P O Box 3000

Orlando, FL 32802

ERIC L HOSTETLER

1980 Michigan Ave

Cocoa, FL 32922

Trustee Attorney

TANYA D SIMPSON

Po Box 11438

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33339-1438

 

Court Documents

WORKSHEET

11/17/2009 : WORKSHEET

ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

11/18/2009 : ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

MOTION OF/FOR DEFAULT

03/03/2010 : MOTION OF/FOR DEFAULT

NOTICE OF FILING

03/25/2010 : NOTICE OF FILING

TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

11/17/2009 : TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION

07/16/2010 : AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION

ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

02/08/2010 : ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

RETURNED SUMMONS UNEXECUTED

12/18/2009 : RETURNED SUMMONS UNEXECUTED

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

11/17/2009 : NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2011
  • Docket(#38) Docket Type: ADMINISTRATIVE RECLOSE; Description: of docket 35.000 per AO-2010-215

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) Docket Type: CERTIFICATE FOR DISBURSEMENT / DISTRIBUTION; Description: Instrument: 2010138087 Book: 6500 Page: 2428

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) Docket Type: CERTIFICATE OF TITLE; Description: 4co/4env Instrument: 2010138086 Book: 6500 Page: 2427

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2010
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 50.00; Final Amount: 50.00; Credits: -50.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) Docket Type: MOTION TO CANCEL SALE; Description: by Bank of New York

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2010
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 70.00; Final Amount: 70.00; Credits: -70.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2010
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 0.70; Final Amount: 0.70; Credits: -0.70; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) Docket Type: CERTIFICATE OF/FOR SALE; Description: 4 co w/title

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) Docket Type: FACT SHEET / REAL PROPERTY SALE; Description: $100 bid by ptf; have all

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) Docket Type: AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION; Description: of post judgment interest and advances by Tat Lin Angus

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 11/17/2009
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 2.50; Final Amount: 2.50; Credits: -2.50; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Docket Type: TWENTY DAY SUMMONS; Description: To UNKNOWN TENANT NO 2 fwd to proc serv(Max)@ctr for sop

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: TWENTY DAY SUMMONS; Description: To UNKNOWN TENANT NO 1 fwd to proc serv(Max)@ctr for sop

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: TWENTY DAY SUMMONS; Description: To THE HERITAGE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC fwd to proc serv(Max)@ctr for sop

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: TWENTY DAY SUMMONS; Description: To SPACE COAST CREDIT UNION fwd to proc serv(Max)@ctr for sop

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: TWENTY DAY SUMMONS; Description: To SUSAN R COBB fwd to proc serv(Max)@ctr for sop

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS; Description: Instrument: 2009217158 Book: 6419 Page: 1562

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: WORKSHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: COMPLAINT / PETITION TO FORECLOSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HERITAGE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Space Coast Credit Union is a litigant

Latest cases where The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BAKER, D SCOTT