This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 04/04/2020 at 00:38:42 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA N A V. RICKY TORRES

Case Summary

On 09/24/2019 BANK OF AMERICA N A filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against RICKY TORRES. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Dawn P. Fields. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********COCI

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Volusia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Dawn P. Fields

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HAYT HAYT & LANDAU

BANK OF AMERICA N A

Defendant

RICKY TORRES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DANA M STERN

Attorney at HAYT HAYT & LANDAU P L

7765 S W 87 Ave Ste 101

Miami, FL 33173

JASON S DRAGUTSKY

Attorney at HAYT HAYT & LANDAU P L

7765 Sw 87 Ave Ste 101

Miami, FL 33173

 

Court Documents

ORDER APPROVING / AFFIRMING / CONFIRMING STIPULATION or SETTLEMENT

03/03/2020 : ORDER APPROVING / AFFIRMING / CONFIRMING STIPULATION or SETTLEMENT

STIPULATION FOR/OF PAYMENT(S)

03/03/2020 : STIPULATION FOR/OF PAYMENT(S)

COURT NOTES

03/03/2020 : COURT NOTES

RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

02/07/2020 : RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

01/27/2020 : PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

REQUEST FOR ALIAS SUMMONS

01/21/2020 : REQUEST FOR ALIAS SUMMONS

MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

01/21/2020 : MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

COURT NOTES

10/22/2019 : COURT NOTES

RETURNED SUMMONS UNEXECUTED

10/16/2019 : RETURNED SUMMONS UNEXECUTED

ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

09/30/2019 : ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

09/26/2019 : PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

09/24/2019 : REQUEST SUMMONS

MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

09/24/2019 : MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

COMPLAINT

09/24/2019 : COMPLAINT

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-Trial; Court Officer: Dawn P. Fields; Location: CI-10, City Island Courthouse; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Docket Type: ORDER APPROVING / AFFIRMING / CONFIRMING STIPULATION or SETTLEMENT; Description: Instrument: 2020048068 Book: 7825 Page: 1851

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Docket Type: STIPULATION FOR/OF PAYMENT(S); Description: agst Ricky Torres Instrument: 2020048065 Book: 7825 Page: 1837

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Docket Type: COURT NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED; Description: Ricky Torres

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS; Description: ALIAS To RICKY TORRES fwd to proc serv (MAX) by e-service for sop cc pltf atty by e-service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Docket Type: REQUEST FOR ALIAS SUMMONS; Description: to Ricky Torres

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.; Description: by Bank of America NA w/out prop order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-Trial; Court Officer: Dawn P. Fields; Location: CI-10, City Island Courthouse; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: COURT NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS UNEXECUTED; Description: Ricky Torres

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 300.00; Final Amount: 300.00; Credits: -300.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS; Description: To RICKY TORRES fwd to pltf atty via e-service for sop; cc pltf atty via e-service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Ricky Torres

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.; Description: by Bank of America NA w/no proposed order atchd

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less