Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 03/25/2020 at 02:44:53 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA N A V. MAHER F YASSINE

Case Summary

On 09/03/2019 BANK OF AMERICA N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MAHER F YASSINE. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Leah R. Case. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CICI

  • Filing Date:

    09/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Volusia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Leah R. Case

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ANDREU PALMA LAVIN & SOLIS PLLC

BANK OF AMERICA N A

Defendant

MAHER F YASSINE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DESIREE M LAVIN

Attorney at ANDREU PALMA LAVIN SOLIS PLLC

815 Nw 57Th Avenue Suite 401

Miami, FL 33126-2363

Defendant Attorney

SCOTT W CICHON

Cobb Cole 149 S Ridgewood Ave #700

Daytona Beach, FL 32115-2491

 

Court Documents

ORDER APPROVING / AFFIRMING / CONFIRMING STIPULATION or SETTLEMENT

03/17/2020 : ORDER APPROVING / AFFIRMING / CONFIRMING STIPULATION or SETTLEMENT

MOTION BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

02/12/2020 : MOTION BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

STIPULATION FOR/OF PAYMENT(S)

01/16/2020 : STIPULATION FOR/OF PAYMENT(S)

MOTION FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME

10/17/2019 : MOTION FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME

RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

09/30/2019 : RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

09/12/2019 : ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

09/10/2019 : TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

09/03/2019 : REQUEST SUMMONS

AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE / VENUE

09/03/2019 : AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE / VENUE

MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

09/03/2019 : MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

COMPLAINT

09/03/2019 : COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/03/2019 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Docket Type: ORDER APPROVING / AFFIRMING / CONFIRMING STIPULATION or SETTLEMENT; Description: Instrument: 2020056652 Book: 7830 Page: 2758

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Docket Type: MOTION BY/FOR PLAINTIFF; Description: Bank of America for approval of settlement stip

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Docket Type: STIPULATION FOR/OF PAYMENT(S); Description: agst Maher F Yassine Instrument: 2020012802 Book: 7803 Page: 1914

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Docket Type: MOTION FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME; Description: to respond to complaint by Maher F Yassine

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED; Description: Maher F Yassine

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 400.00; Final Amount: 400.00; Credits: -400.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: TWENTY DAY SUMMONS; Description: To MAHER F YASSINE ret to atty via e service for SOP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Maher F Yassine

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE / VENUE; Description: as to Maher F Yassine

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.; Description: by Bank of America N A w/o Or

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: NOTICE FOR REDACTION/CONFIDENTIALITY; Description: by Bank of America N A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ANDREU PALMA LAVIN SOLIS PLLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCOTT W CICHON