This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 06/10/2023 at 10:28:17 (UTC).

ASHLEY SMITH V. MATTHEW DAUGHERTY

Case Summary

On 06/27/2022 ASHLEY SMITH filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against MATTHEW DAUGHERTY. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Matthew M. Foxman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********FMDL

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Matthew M. Foxman

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ASHLEY SMITH

Respondent

MATTHEW DAUGHERTY

Not Classified By Court

MATTHEW DOUGHERTY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

J CRAIG BOURNE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

08/08/2023

DocketSession Type: Non-Jury Trial; Court Officer: Matthew M. Foxman; Location: D-409, DeLand; Status: Scheduled

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/22/2023

Docket(#40); Docket Type: NOTICE OF/FOR TRIAL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/04/2023

DocketSession Type: Docket Sounding; Court Officer: Matthew M. Foxman; Location: MFZM, Zoom Meetings; Status: Scheduled

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/04/2023

Docket(#39); Docket Type: ORDER REGARDING; Description: docket sounding

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/04/2023

Docket(#38); Docket Type: HEARING SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/21/2023

Docket(#37); Docket Type: ORDER OF CASE MANAGEMENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/20/2023

DocketSession Type: Case Management Conference; Court Officer: Matthew M. Foxman; Location: MFZM, Zoom Meetings; Status: Scheduled

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/20/2023

Docket(#36); Docket Type: HEARING SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/19/2022

DocketSession Type: Case Management Conference; Court Officer: Matthew M. Foxman; Location: MFZM, Zoom Meetings; Status: Scheduled

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/19/2022

Docket(#35); Docket Type: ORDER ALLOWING WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY; Description: atty Adam A Haba obo pet

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
28 More Docket Entries
06/27/2022

Docket(#11); Docket Type: SUMMONS ISSUED; Description: as to Petition to Determine Paternity and for Related Relief To MATTHEW DAUGHERTY Mailed to Pet for Service on the Resp

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/27/2022

Docket(#10); Docket Type: INFORMATION SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/27/2022

Docket(#9); Docket Type: COPY OF ID/DRIVER'S LICENSE; Description: Pet

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/27/2022

Docket(#8); Docket Type: DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/27/2022

Docket(#7); Docket Type: NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/27/2022

Docket(#5); Docket Type: FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT; Description: Pet

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/27/2022

Docket(#4); Docket Type: AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/27/2022

Docket(#3); Docket Type: MOTION BY/FOR PETITIONER; Description: *Emergency mtn for Temp Custody/Emailed Judge & JA*

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/27/2022

Docket(#2); Docket Type: PETITION FOR PATERNITY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/27/2022

Docket(#1); Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less