Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 04/11/2020 at 01:25:41 (UTC).

ARGENTUM FINANCIAL LLC V. SHERI PIERSON

Case Summary

On 11/14/2019 ARGENTUM FINANCIAL LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SHERI PIERSON. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Kathryn Weston. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CIDL

  • Filing Date:

    11/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Volusia County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Volusia County Courthouse Deland

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Kathryn Weston

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KELLEY KRONENBERG

ARGENTUM FINANCIAL LLC

Defendant

SHERI PIERSON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ALISON V WALTERS

Kelley Kronenberg 1511 N Westshore Blvd Ste 400

Tampa, FL 33607

 

Court Documents

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

03/05/2020 : FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

03/05/2020 : CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

DEFAULT JUDGMENT / FINAL JUDGMENT

03/02/2020 : DEFAULT JUDGMENT / FINAL JUDGMENT

AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF PROOF / AMOUNT DUE

02/18/2020 : AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF PROOF / AMOUNT DUE

AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION FOR/OF ATTORNEY'S FEES

02/18/2020 : AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION FOR/OF ATTORNEY'S FEES

MOTION FOR JUDGMENT / FINAL JUDGMENT

02/18/2020 : MOTION FOR JUDGMENT / FINAL JUDGMENT

DEFAULT

02/12/2020 : DEFAULT

AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE / VENUE

02/07/2020 : AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE / VENUE

MOTION OF/FOR DEFAULT

02/07/2020 : MOTION OF/FOR DEFAULT

RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

02/07/2020 : RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

11/15/2019 : TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

11/14/2019 : REQUEST SUMMONS

COMPLAINT

11/14/2019 : COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/14/2019 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Docket Type: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Docket Type: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE; Description: of Default FJ by Argentum Financial LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Docket Type: DEFAULT JUDGMENT / FINAL JUDGMENT; Description: agst Sheir Pierson for $17,545.99 Instrument: 2020046401 Book: 7824 Page: 1297

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Docket Type: AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF PROOF / AMOUNT DUE; Description: by Donna Robinson obo Argentum Financial LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Docket Type: AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION FOR/OF ATTORNEY'S FEES; Description: by Alison Verges Walters Esq & costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Docket Type: MOTION FOR JUDGMENT / FINAL JUDGMENT; Description: by Argentum Financial LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: DEFAULT; Description: as to Sheri Pierson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE / VENUE; Description: as to Sheri Pierson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: MOTION OF/FOR DEFAULT; Description: as to Sheri Pierson w/prop default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED; Description: Sheri Pierson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 400.00; Final Amount: 400.00; Credits: -400.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: TWENTY DAY SUMMONS; Description: To SHERI PIERSON ret to atty via e service for SOP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Sheri Pierson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Argentum Financial LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Walters, Alison Verges