Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 03/21/2020 at 04:04:27 (UTC).

APEX AUTO GLASS LLC A/A/O WALTER GONZALEZ V. GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 10/20/2019 APEX AUTO GLASS LLC A/A/O WALTER GONZALEZ filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Angela A. Dempsey. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CODL

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Volusia County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Volusia County Courthouse Deland

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Angela A. Dempsey

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

APEX AUTO GLASS LLC A/A/O WALTER GONZALEZ

WALTER GONZALEZ

Defendants

GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DONALD J MASTEN

Po Box 4449

Orlando, FL 32802

Defendant Attorney

LINDSEY R TROWELL

Attorney at SMITH GAMBRELL & RUSSELL LLP

50 N Laura St Ste 2600

Jacksonville, FL 32202

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF/FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

03/19/2020 : NOTICE OF/FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

MOTION FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME

03/03/2020 : MOTION FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME

MOTION FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME

02/27/2020 : MOTION FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME

MOTION FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME

02/26/2020 : MOTION FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME

MOTION FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME

02/13/2020 : MOTION FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

02/02/2020 : REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

01/28/2020 : NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

01/27/2020 : REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT

01/21/2020 : MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

10/20/2019 : REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

10/20/2019 : REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

10/20/2019 : REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

10/20/2019 : REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

10/20/2019 : NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

10/20/2019 : DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

REQUEST SUMMONS

10/20/2019 : REQUEST SUMMONS

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

10/20/2019 : STATEMENT OF CLAIM

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/20/2019 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

47 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#58) Docket Type: NOTICE OF/FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Description: w/prej by Apex Auto etc Instrument: 2020059418 Book: 7832 Page: 779

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#57) Docket Type: MOTION FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME; Description: to respond to pltf's discovery by Geico Indemnity Co

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#56) Docket Type: MOTION FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME; Description: to respond to discovery by Geico

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#55) Docket Type: MOTION FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME; Description: to respond to discovery by Geico Indemnity Co

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) Docket Type: MOTION FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME; Description: to respond to discovery by Geico Indmemnity Co

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) Docket Type: REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Description: to GEICO Indemnity Company by Apex Auto Glass LLC etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Description: (2nd) to Geico Indemnity Co by Apex Auto Glass LLC etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) Docket Type: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Description: (2nd) to Geico Indemnity Co by Apex Auto Glass LLC etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) Docket Type: MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT; Description: by Apex Auto Glass etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) Docket Type: NOTICE TO WITHDRAW; Description: Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Apex Auto Glass LLC.,etc

    Read MoreRead Less
42 More Docket Entries
  • 10/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Docket Type: REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Description: to Geico General Ins Co by Apex Auto Glass LLC etc (initial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Docket Type: REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Description: to Geico General Ins Co by Apex Auto Glass LLC etc (claims procedure)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Description: to Geico General Ins Co by Apex Auto Glass LLC etc (3rd party software programs utilized)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Description: to Geico General Ins Co by Apex Auto Glass LLC etc (Safelite)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Description: to Geico General Ins Co by Apex Auto Glass LLC etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Description: to Geico General Ins Co by Apex Auto Glass LLC etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS; Description: Donald J Masten

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: as to Geico General Ins Co

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where APEX AUTO GLASS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Trowell, Lindsey R