Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 03/02/2020 at 09:28:43 (UTC).

APEX AUTO GLASS LLC A/A/O DUSTIN DEVINE V. ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 10/20/2019 APEX AUTO GLASS LLC A/A/O DUSTIN DEVINE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is A. Christian Miller. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CODL

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Volusia County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Volusia County Courthouse Deland

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

A. Christian Miller

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DUSTIN DEVINE

APEX AUTO GLASS LLC A/A/O DUSTIN DEVINE

Defendant

ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DONALD J MASTEN

Po Box 4449

Orlando, FL 32802

Defendant Attorney

CHRISTOPHER J MARTIN

Law Offices Of Robert J Smith 390 N Orange Ave Ste 895

Orlando, FL 32801-1635

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF/FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

02/22/2020 : NOTICE OF/FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

MOTION TO COMPEL

01/28/2020 : MOTION TO COMPEL

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

01/28/2020 : NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

01/27/2020 : REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

MOTION BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

01/27/2020 : MOTION BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

MOTION BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

01/15/2020 : MOTION BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

MOTION BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

01/07/2020 : MOTION BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT

01/04/2020 : MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT

RESPONSE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

12/29/2019 : RESPONSE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

10/20/2019 : REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

10/20/2019 : REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

10/20/2019 : REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

10/20/2019 : REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

10/20/2019 : NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST SUMMONS

10/20/2019 : REQUEST SUMMONS

DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

10/20/2019 : DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

10/20/2019 : STATEMENT OF CLAIM

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/20/2019 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) Docket Type: NOTICE OF/FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Description: w/prej by Apex Auto Glass etc Instrument: 2020039305 Book: 7819 Page: 1858

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) Docket Type: MOTION TO COMPEL; Description: production or Motion in Limine and Motion for Sanctions by Apex Auto Glass LLC.,etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Description: (2nd) to Allstate Insurance Co by Apex Auto Glass LLC.,etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) Docket Type: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Description: (2nd) to Allstate Insurance Company by Apex Auto Glass LLC etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) Docket Type: MOTION BY/FOR PLAINTIFF; Description: Apex Auto Glass LLC etc to deem req for admissions admitted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) Docket Type: MOTION BY/FOR PLAINTIFF; Description: Apex Auto Glass LLC, to deny dfts request for appraisal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) Docket Type: MOTION BY/FOR PLAINTIFF; Description: Apex Auto Glass LLC.,etc to deny deft's Motion to Dismiss & Request for Appraisal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) Docket Type: MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT; Description: (partial) by Apex Auto Glass LLC etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) Docket Type: RESPONSE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF; Description: Apex Auto Glass LLC,etc to Motion to Dismiss

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Docket Type: MOTION TO STRIKE; Description: deft's demand for appraisal and Motion for Confession of Judgment by Apex Auto Glass LLC.,etc

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 10/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Docket Type: REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Description: (initial) to Allstate Ins Co by Apex Auto Glass etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Docket Type: REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Description: (claims procedure) to Allstate Ins Co by Apex Auto Glass etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Description: (3rd party software programs utilized) to Allstate Ins Co by Apex Auto Glass etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Description: (Safelite) to Allstate Ins Co by Apex Auto Glass etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Description: to Allstate Ins Co by Apex Auto Glass etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Description: to Allstate Ins Co by Apex Auto Glass etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: as to Allstate Ins Co

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS; Description: Donald J Masten

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where APEX AUTO GLASS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Allstate Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MASTEN , DONALD JAMES