Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 03/25/2020 at 14:07:01 (UTC).

APEX AUTO GLASS LLC AAO DONNA SOPPER V. GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/05/2019 APEX AUTO GLASS LLC AAO DONNA SOPPER filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is A. Christian Miller. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CODL

  • Filing Date:

    11/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Volusia County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Volusia County Courthouse Deland

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

A. Christian Miller

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DONNA SOPPER

APEX AUTO GLASS LLC AAO DONNA SOPPER

Defendant

GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DONALD J MASTEN

Po Box 4449

Orlando, FL 32802

Defendant Attorney

LINDSEY R TROWELL

Attorney at SMITH GAMBRELL & RUSSELL LLP

50 N Laura St Ste 2600

Jacksonville, FL 32202

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF/FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

03/19/2020 : NOTICE OF/FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

MOTION FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME

03/03/2020 : MOTION FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME

MOTION FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME

02/27/2020 : MOTION FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME

MOTION FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME

02/27/2020 : MOTION FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

02/02/2020 : REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

01/28/2020 : NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

01/27/2020 : REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT

01/22/2020 : MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT

MOTION TO COMPEL

01/22/2020 : MOTION TO COMPEL

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

11/05/2019 : REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

11/05/2019 : REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

11/05/2019 : REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

11/05/2019 : REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

11/05/2019 : REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

11/05/2019 : REQUEST TO PRODUCE

DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

11/05/2019 : DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

11/05/2019 : STATEMENT OF CLAIM

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/05/2019 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

41 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) Docket Type: NOTICE OF/FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Description: w/prej by Apex Auto Glass LLC aao Donna Sopper Instrument: 2020059342 Book: 7832 Page: 641

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) Docket Type: MOTION FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME; Description: to respond to discovery by Geico General Insurance Co

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) Docket Type: MOTION FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME; Description: to respond to pltfs discovery by Geico General Ins Co

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) Docket Type: MOTION FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME; Description: to respond to pltfs discovery by Geico General Ins Co

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) Docket Type: REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Description: to GEICO General Insurance Company by Apex Auto Glass LLC etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Description: (2nd)to Geico General Insurance Co by Apex Auto Glass LLC.,etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) Docket Type: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Description: (2nd) to Geico General Insurance Co by Apex Auto Glass LLC Etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) Docket Type: MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT; Description: by Apex Auto Glass LLC.,etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) Docket Type: MOTION TO COMPEL; Description: production re:pltf's request for produciton (safelite)and motion for sanctions by Apex Auto Glass LLC.,etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) Docket Type: MOTION TO COMPEL; Description: production re:pltf's request for produciton (claims procedure)and motion for sanctions by Apex Auto Glass LLC.,etc

    Read MoreRead Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Description: to Geico Gen Ins Co by Apex Auto Glass LLC etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Docket Type: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Description: to Geico Gen Ins Co by Apex Auto Glass LLC etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Description: to Geico Gen Ins Co (3rd party software programs utilized) by Apex Auto Glass LLC etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Description: to Geico Gen Ins Co (claims procedures) by Apex Auto Glass LLC etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Description: to Geico Gen Ins Co (Safelite) by Apex Auto Glass LLC etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Description: to Geico Gen Ins Co (agent pricing) by Apex Auto Glass LLC etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Description: to Geico Gen Ins Co (initial) by Apex Auto Glass LLC etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS; Description: by Donald J Masten

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where APEX AUTO GLASS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Trowell, Lindsey R