Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 03/25/2020 at 12:49:36 (UTC).

APEX AUTO GLASS LLC A/A/O CYRUS AUGUSTIN V. GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/21/2019 APEX AUTO GLASS LLC A/A/O CYRUS AUGUSTIN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is A. Christian Miller. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CODL

  • Filing Date:

    11/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Volusia County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Volusia County Courthouse Deland

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

A. Christian Miller

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CYRUS AUGUSTIN

APEX AUTO GLASS LLC A/A/O CYRUS AUGUSTIN

DONALD J MASTEN

Defendants

GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DONALD J MASTEN

Po Box 4449

Orlando, FL 32802

Defendant Attorney

LINDSEY R TROWELL

Attorney at SMITH GAMBRELL & RUSSELL LLP

50 N Laura St Ste 2600

Jacksonville, FL 32202

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF/FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

03/19/2020 : NOTICE OF/FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

MOTION FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME

03/03/2020 : MOTION FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME

MOTION FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME

02/27/2020 : MOTION FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME

MOTION FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME

02/26/2020 : MOTION FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

02/02/2020 : REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE

01/27/2020 : NOTICE OF SERVICE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

01/27/2020 : REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

ORDER TO SUBSTITUTE PARTY DEFENDANT

01/27/2020 : ORDER TO SUBSTITUTE PARTY DEFENDANT

STIPULATION

01/24/2020 : STIPULATION

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

11/21/2019 : REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

11/21/2019 : REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

11/21/2019 : REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

11/21/2019 : NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

11/21/2019 : NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

11/21/2019 : NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

11/21/2019 : DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

REQUEST SUMMONS

11/21/2019 : REQUEST SUMMONS

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

11/21/2019 : STATEMENT OF CLAIM

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) Docket Type: NOTICE OF/FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Description: w/prej by Apex Auto Glass etc Instrument: 2020059392 Book: 7832 Page: 743

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) Docket Type: MOTION FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME; Description: to respond to pltf's discovery by Geico Indemnity Co

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) Docket Type: MOTION FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME; Description: to respond to pltfs discovery by Geico Indemnity Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) Docket Type: MOTION FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME; Description: to respond to pltfs discovery by Geico Indemnity Co

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) Docket Type: REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Description: to GEICO Indemnity Company by Apex Auto Glass LLC etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE; Description: of second interrogs by Apex Auto Glass LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) Docket Type: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Description: second, to Geico General Insurance Company, by Apex Auto Glass LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) Docket Type: ORDER TO SUBSTITUTE PARTY DEFENDANT; Description: to Geico Indemnity Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27.5) Docket Type: STIPULATION; Description: to substitute party deft to Geico Indemnity Company by all parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) Docket Type: MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT; Description: (Partial)by Apex Auto Glass LLC.,etc

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Docket Type: REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Description: to Geico General Insurance Company, 3rd party software programs utilized by Apex Auto Glass LLC etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Docket Type: REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Description: to Geico General Insurance Company, claims procedure by Apex Auto Glass LLC etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Description: to Geico General Insurance Company, initial by Apex Auto Glass LLC etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Description: to Geico General Insurance Company by Apex Auto Glass LLC etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Description: to Geico General Insurance Company by Apex Auto Glass LLC etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY; Description: Mitchell International Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY; Description: Safelite Solutions LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS; Description: Donald J Masten

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: Geico General Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where APEX AUTO GLASS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MASTEN , DONALD JAMES