Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 03/09/2020 at 15:34:05 (UTC).

APEX AUTO GLASS LLC AAO CHERI ADAME V. ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/25/2019 APEX AUTO GLASS LLC AAO CHERI ADAME filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Angela A. Dempsey. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CODL

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Volusia County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Volusia County Courthouse Deland

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Angela A. Dempsey

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

APEX AUTO GLASS LLC AAO CHERI ADAME

CHERI ADAME

Defendant

ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DONALD J MASTEN

Po Box 4449

Orlando, FL 32802

Defendant Attorney

CHRISTOPHER J MARTIN

Law Offices Of Robert J Smith 390 N Orange Ave Ste 895

Orlando, FL 32801-1635

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF/FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

02/22/2020 : NOTICE OF/FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

MOTION TO DISMISS / DISSOLVE

01/28/2020 : MOTION TO DISMISS / DISSOLVE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

01/28/2020 : NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

01/27/2020 : REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

ORDER APPROVING / AFFIRMING / CONFIRMING STIPULATION or SETTLEMENT

01/08/2020 : ORDER APPROVING / AFFIRMING / CONFIRMING STIPULATION or SETTLEMENT

STIPULATION

01/07/2020 : STIPULATION

MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT

01/04/2020 : MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT

RESPONSE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

12/26/2019 : RESPONSE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

REQUEST BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

12/26/2019 : REQUEST BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

11/25/2019 : REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

11/25/2019 : REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

11/25/2019 : REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

11/25/2019 : REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

11/25/2019 : REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

11/25/2019 : NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

11/25/2019 : REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

11/25/2019 : DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

11/25/2019 : STATEMENT OF CLAIM

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) Docket Type: NOTICE OF/FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Description: w/prej by Apex Auto Glass etc Instrument: 2020039293 Book: 7819 Page: 1838

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) Docket Type: MOTION TO DISMISS / DISSOLVE; Description: by Allstate Insurance Co

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Description: (2nd)to Allstate Insurance Co by Apex Auto Glass LLC.,etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) Docket Type: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Description: (2nd) to Allstate Insurance Company by Apex Auto Glass LLC etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • HearingSession Type: Pre-Trial; Court Officer: Angela A. Dempsey; Location: 1, DeLand; Status: Cancelled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) Docket Type: ORDER APPROVING / AFFIRMING / CONFIRMING STIPULATION or SETTLEMENT; Description: waiving pretrial conference and Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) Docket Type: STIPULATION; Description: to waive appearance at pre-trial conference and invoke the rules of civil procedure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Docket Type: MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT; Description: (Partial)based on Non-Appraisable Coverage Issue Re Silence of Policy as to Glass Shop Fees/Surcharges by Apex Auto Glass LLC etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Docket Type: RESPONSE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF; Description: Apex Auto Glass LLC.,etc to deft's objection to Notice of Production of Non Party re:Mitchell Internationa Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Docket Type: REQUEST BY/FOR PLAINTIFF; Description: Apex Auto Glass LLc,etc to take Judicial Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Docket Type: REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Description: (3rd pty software programs utilized)to Allstate Ins Co by Apex Auto Glass LLC etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Docket Type: REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Description: (reimbursement) to Allstate Ins Co by Apex Auto Glass LLC etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Description: (agent pricing) to Allstate Ins Co by Apex Auto Glass LLC etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Description: (Claims procedures) to Allstate Ins Co by Apex Auto Glass LLC etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Description: (Safelite) to Allstate Ins Co by Apex Auto Glass LLC etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Description: (initial) to Allstate Ins Co by Apex Auto Glass LLC etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Description: to Allstate Ins Co by Apex Auto Glass LLC etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Description: to Allstate Ins Co by Apex Auto Glass LLC etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS; Description: by Donald J Masten

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where APEX AUTO GLASS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Allstate Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MASTEN , DONALD JAMES