This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 02/29/2020 at 13:15:19 (UTC).

APEX AUTO GLASS LLC A A O WILLIE GALLON V. ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/30/2020 APEX AUTO GLASS LLC A A O WILLIE GALLON filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Dawn P. Fields. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********COCI

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Volusia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Dawn P. Fields

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WILLIE GALLON

APEX AUTO GLASS LLC A A O WILLIE GALLON

Defendant

ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DONALD J MASTEN

Po Box 4449

Orlando, FL 32802

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF/FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

02/22/2020 : NOTICE OF/FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

02/03/2020 : PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

02/03/2020 : PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

01/30/2020 : REQUEST SUMMONS

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

01/30/2020 : REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

01/30/2020 : REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

01/30/2020 : REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

01/30/2020 : REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

01/30/2020 : REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

01/30/2020 : REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE TO PRODUCE

01/30/2020 : NOTICE TO PRODUCE

NOTICE TO PRODUCE

01/30/2020 : NOTICE TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

01/30/2020 : NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

01/30/2020 : NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

01/30/2020 : DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

01/30/2020 : STATEMENT OF CLAIM

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2020
  • HearingSession Type: Pre-Trial; Court Officer: Dawn P. Fields; Location: CI-10, City Island Courthouse; Status: Voided; Comments: VOID

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • HearingSession Type: Pre-Trial; Court Officer: Dawn P. Fields; Location: CI-10, City Island Courthouse; Status: Cancelled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Docket Type: NOTICE OF/FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Description: w/prej by Apex Auto Glass etc Instrument: 2020039446 Book: 7819 Page: 2151

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 175.00; Final Amount: 175.00; Credits: -175.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS; Description: CORRECTED To ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY fwd to pltf's atty via eservice for SOP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS; Description: To ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY fwd to pltf's atty via eservice for SOP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Allstate Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Docket Type: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Description: to Allstate Insurance Company by Apex Auto Glass, LLC etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Docket Type: REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Description: (agent pricing) to Allstate Insurance Company by Apex Auto Glass, LLC etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Docket Type: REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Description: (Safelite) to Allstate Insurance Company by Apex Auto Glass, LLC etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Docket Type: REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Description: (third party software programs utilized) to Allstate Insurance Company by Apex Auto Glass, LLC etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Description: (claims procedure) to Allstate Insurance Company by Apex Auto Glass, LLC etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Description: (initial) to Allstate Insurance Company by Apex Auto Glass, LLC etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: NOTICE TO PRODUCE; Description: (non-party) to Safelite Solutions, LLC by Apex Auto Glass, LLC etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: NOTICE TO PRODUCE; Description: (non-party) to Mitchell International, Inc. by Apex Auto Glass, LLC etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Description: to Allstate Insurance Company by Apex Auto Glass, LLC etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY; Description: by Donald J. Masten, Esquire

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS; Description: by Donald J. Masten, Esquire

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: STATEMENT OF CLAIM; Description: claim amount: $501 - $2,500

    Read MoreRead Less